Thomas et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Everett L. Thomas and Martha A. Thomas
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank Home Mortgage, Barrett Daffin Frappier & Weiss, LLP and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2015cv02344
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/4/17. (dlg)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Defendant's 41 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. The Court Orders Mr. La Costa and Plaintiffs Everett L. Thomas and Martha A. Thomas compensate Defendant the sum of $550.00 for the two hours of attorney time incurred by Mr. Newman in preparing Defendant's discovery motion. The sanction shall be remitted to Defendant no later than February 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 1/25/17. (dlg)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 34 Defendant's Request for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/6/16. (dlg)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Second 18 Motion to Dismiss. Within thirty (30) days of the issuance of this Order, Plaintiff must file either a second amended complaint or a notice of election not to file a second amended complaint. Defendant must file any response within fourteen (14) days after service of the amended pleading. The hearing on this motion, currently set for April 29, 2016, is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/28/16. (dlg)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 3 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss. Within thirty (30) days of the issuance of this Order, Plaintiff must file either a second amended complaint or a notice of election not to file an amended complaint. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the action. Defendant must file any response within fourteen (14) days after service of the amended pleading. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/14/16. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett L. Thomas
Represented By: Joseph La Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha A. Thomas
Represented By: Joseph La Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Michael Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier & Weiss, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?