BofI Federal Bank v. Erhart et al
Plaintiff: BofI Federal Bank
Defendant: Charles Matthew Erhart and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2015cv02353
Filed: October 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Quash BofI's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/2/2017. (fth)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying Plaintiff Bofl Federal Bank's 18 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court dissolves the temporary restraining order 10 and the supplemental temporary restraining order 17 . Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/7/2016. (jah)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Determining 54 Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute No. 3. Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's Motion to compel production of the documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/5/2016. (jah)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 39 Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute No. 1; granting Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Compel Responses to the Subpoena. Court orders that by 5/10/2016, Carol Gillam must produce to Bofl all documents in her possession, custody and control that respond to each of the requests in the subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/26/2016. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BofI Federal Bank v. Erhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BofI Federal Bank
Represented By: Polly Towill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Matthew Erhart
Represented By: Carol Gillam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?