Cannon v. Austal USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: William J. Cannon
Defendant: Austal USA LLC and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv02582
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER on Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 157 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/28/2019. (anh)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Tax Costs [Doc. No. 148 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/08/2017. (ajs)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Austal's motion for summary judgment is Granted; The United States' motion for summary judgment is Granted; The pending motions in limine [Doc. Nos. 108-110, 131, 132] are Denied As Moot; and, The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter Judgment in favor of Austal and the United States and against Plaintiff, and to Close this case. It is So Ordered.(jjg)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Denying Third Party Defendant Austal's Motion to Withdraw Show Cause Order and Imposing Sanctions [ECF No. 106 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/03/2017.(jjg)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions or Increase Number of Depositions to Twenty [ECF No. 85 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/7/2017. (jjg)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Alter Briefing Schedule and Denying Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff's Treating Physicians for Trial Purposes After the Close of Expert Discovery [ECF Nos. 76 , 81 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/2/2017. (jjg)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [ECF No. 62 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/25/2017. (jjg)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting In Part Third Party Defendant Austal USA, LLC's Motion to Compel [ECF No. 64 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/14/2017. (jjg)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/23/2017. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Austal USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Cannon
Represented By: Frank S Clowney, III
Represented By: Charlotte Discon
Represented By: Thomas Discon
Represented By: Robert Lansden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austal USA LLC
Represented By: Rudy Huerta Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?