Calcaterra v. Garrabrants et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Calcaterra
Defendant: Gregory Garrabrants, Andrew J. Micheletti, Theodore C. Allrich, Nicholas A. Mosich, James S. Argalas, John Gary Burke, Paul J. Grinberg, James J. Court, Edward J. Ratinoff, Eshel Bar-Adon, John C. Tolla, Uzair Dada and BofI Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02722
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting Defendants' 133 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/23/19. (dlg)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Denying 118 Motion to Stay; and Denying 119 as Moot Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Within 21 days of the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/21/18. (dlg)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting in Part 95 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Within 21 days of this ruling, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/7/18. (dlg)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling Granting in Part Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 95 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/11/18.(dlg)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: (1) Denying 68 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (2) Granting 58 , 63 , 69 Plaintiffs' Motions to Seal. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss the amended shareholder complaint. Dkt. No. 68. The Court also GRANTS Plain tiffs' motions to (1) seal portions of the ASC, Dkt. No. 58, 63, and (2) portions of their response opposition, Dkt. No. 69. Defendants' request that the Court take judicial notice of BofI's Form 8-K filed with the SEC is DENIED as moot because it was irrelevant to the Court's review of the ASC. Dkt. No. 68-2. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/8/2017. (aef)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting Leave to Amend 41 . The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend the CSC. Any amended complaint shall be filed on or before Friday, April 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/10/17.(dlg)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Defendants' 41 Motion to Dismiss; granting 42 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 48 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 50 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Court will reserve ruling whether or not the motion is granted with or without prejudice until after hearing from the respective parties. Given that the related shareholder litigation, 16cv2723-GPC(KSC) is ripe for decision on the merits, Court is inclined to find that providing the sh areholders here, with leave to amend their demand futility allegations would be futile. Court orders Plaintiffs to show cause why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice. Defendants shall file a response due by 3/31/2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/1/2017. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calcaterra v. Garrabrants et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Calcaterra
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Garrabrants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore C. Allrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas A. Mosich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Argalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gary Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Grinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Ratinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eshel Bar-Adon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Tolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uzair Dada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofI Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?