Plum Healthcare Group, LLC et al v. OneBeacon Professional Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Plum Healthcare Group, LLC, GI Plum Holdco, LLC and Quince Holdings, LLC
Defendant: OneBeacon Professional Insurance, Homeland Insurance Company of New York and Does 1 through 30
Case Number: 3:2015cv02747
Filed: December 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Request For Summary-Adjudication as to Plaintiffs' Damages. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/15/2017. (jao)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 51 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw and Amend Deemed Admissions. As provided in the attached Order, Defendants may withdraw and amend their previously deemed admissions within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/26/17. (Dembin, Mitchell)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 39 Defendants' Application to Modify The Current Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/24/2017. (jao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plum Healthcare Group, LLC et al v. OneBeacon Professional Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plum Healthcare Group, LLC
Represented By: Richard A Huver
Represented By: Harris I. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GI Plum Holdco, LLC
Represented By: Richard A Huver
Represented By: Harris I. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quince Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard A Huver
Represented By: Harris I. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Professional Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?