American Fireglass v. Moderustic Inc.
Plaintiff: American Fireglass
Defendant: Moderustic Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02866
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0256
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 148 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/04/2019. (jpp)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER on Motion for Clarification of Order re discovery and continuing Mandatory Settlement Conference to 8/30/2019 at 1:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/28/2019. (jpp)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: (1) Granting in part and denying in part 122 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and (2) Granting 123 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/15/2019. (jpp)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER overruling Defendant's objections to Magistrate Judge's discovery order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/11/2019.(jpp)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Denying 69 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/10/2018. (mpl)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Requesting Additional Claim Construction Hearing re 55 . Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief on or before 9/14/2017. Defendant Moderustic, Inc. shall file its responsive brief on or before 9/28/2017. Thereafter the Court will deem the matter submitted and will issue its Claim Construction Order. During this time the parties may also inform the Court if there are any further stipulations to proposed constructions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/5/2017.(mpl)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: (1) granting Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice, and (2) denying 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/25/2016. (kcm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Fireglass v. Moderustic Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Fireglass
Represented By: Charles F Reidelbach, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip C Samouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moderustic Inc.
Represented By: John Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?