Aegis Software, Inc. v. 22nd District Agricultural Association
Plaintiff: Aegis Software, Inc.
Defendant: 22nd District Agricultural Association
Case Number: 3:2015cv02956
Filed: December 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff (ECF No. 47 ). Accordingly, all fact discovery shall be completed by all parties on or before 3/19/2018. On or before 2/16/2018, the parties are required to file a joint discovery schedule setting forth the date, time, and location of all remaining depositions. All other deadlines remain as previously set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/9/2018. (mxn)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' request for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint is Denied because amendment would be futile. Plaintiff's first cause of action is Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/7/2017. (rlu)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/2016. (rlu)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying in part and Granting in part Defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant's motion to dismiss is Denied in part and Granted in part. Plaintiff's motion is Denied as to the third cause of act ion and the fourth cause of action regarding the SDSF Mark. Plaintiff's motion is Granted as to the first, second, fifth, sixth, and seventh causes of action, and as to the fourth cause of action regarding the Competition Mark. Accordingly, Plai ntiff's first, fifth, sixth, and seventh causes of action are Dismissed with prejudice in their entirety. Plaintiff's fourth cause of action as it pertains to the unregistered Competition Mark is also Dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff 9;s second cause of action is Dismissed without prejudice. Finally, the Court Grants Plaintiff's request for leave to amend its second cause of action. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/31/2016. (rlu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aegis Software, Inc. v. 22nd District Agricultural Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aegis Software, Inc.
Represented By: Micah L. Bailey
Represented By: Charles E Purdy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22nd District Agricultural Association
Represented By: Adam Seth Cashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?