Michel v. United States Customs and Border Protection, et al.

Plaintiff: Doyma Vanessa Michel
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection, B. Gibbons, E. Garza, G. Garcia, Safariland, LLC and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2016cv00277
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 93 Motion for Reconsideration. The hearing set for February 15, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/13/18. (dlg)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting Defendant Safariland, LLC's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/31/17. (dlg)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling ( 50 and 53 ) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Safariland, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Counsel are advised that the Court's rulings are tentative and the Court will entertain additional arguments at the hearing on September 8, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/8/17.(dlg)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting Defendant Safariland's 47 Motion for Leave to Amend its Answer and Denying its Request for Attorney's fees and Costs 64 . Safariland shall file an amended answer within three days of the filing of his Order. The hearing set for September 1, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/22/17. (dlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michel v. United States Customs and Border Protection, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyma Vanessa Michel
Represented By: Steven W Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safariland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?