FastVDO LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FastVDO LLC
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC, Huawei Device Co., Ltd., ZTE Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, ZTE (USA) Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., NEC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Apple, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., LG Electronics Inc., Microsoft Mobile Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Counter Claimant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Case Number: 3:2016cv00385
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 312 Costs Taxed in amount of $19,844.92 against FastVDO LLC (sjt)
January 28, 2020 Filing 311 NOTICE of Supplemental Declaration of Daniel E. Musher in Support of Defendant's Bill of Costs by Apple, Inc. re #308 Bill of Costs (Musher, Daniel)(sxa).
January 17, 2020 Filing 310 RESPONSE re #308 Bill of Costs filed by FastVDO LLC. (Conkle, Christian)(sxa).
January 6, 2020 Filing 309 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #308 Bill of Costs filed by Apple, Inc. : Hearing set for 1/23/2020 at 11:00AM. Any opposition or responsive pleading due 1/17/2020. All parties requesting to appear telephonically for this Bill of Costs hearing are directed to join on a conference call, then contact S. Tweedle 619-557-7349 at the time of the hearing. (no document attached) (sjt)
December 18, 2019 Filing 308 BILL OF COSTS submitted by Defendant Apple, Inc. in the amount of $ 29,707.78. Hearing set for 1/7/2020 at 10:00AM. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Ferguson, Brian). (jah).
December 18, 2019 Filing 307 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Apple, Inc. re #306 Bill of Costs, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Ferguson, Brian). (jah).
December 17, 2019 Filing 306 *** WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #307 *** BILL OF COSTS submitted by Defendant Apple, Inc. in the amount of $ 29,707.78. Hearing set for 1/6/2020 at 10:00AM. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Ferguson, Brian). Modified on 12/18/2019 - Wrong pdf attached,. Pdf is Motion to Tax Costs, not Bill of Costs. QC Email sent to withdraw and refile w/ correct pdf (jah). Modified on 12/19/2019 - Edited to reflect as withdrawn (jah).
December 16, 2019 Filing 305 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Apple, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation against FastVDO LLC. Court grants Defendants Apple, Samsung, ZTE, Huawei, LG, and LG Electronics Mobilecomm's Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Court dismisses Plaintiff FastVDO's claims for patentinfringement as moot. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants.(jah)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting #290 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting #292 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting #293 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting #297 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Court grants Defendants Apple, Samsung, ZTE, Huawei, LG, and LG Electronics Mobilecomm's motions for judgment on the pleadings, and the Court dismisses FastVDO's claims for patent infringement as moot. The Court directs the clerk to enter judgment in favor of Defendant(s) and against Plaintiff FastVDO in Case Nos. 16-cv-385, 16-cv-386, 16-cv-394, 16-cv-395, 16-cv-396, and 16-cv-2499.6. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/13/2019. (jah)
December 9, 2019 Filing 303 REPLY to Response to Motion re #297 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.. (Auyang, Heather). (jah).
November 25, 2019 Filing 302 REPLY to Response to Motion re #292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Horton, Timothy). (jah).
November 22, 2019 Filing 301 REPLY to Response to Motion re #291 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Chachkes, Alex). Modified on 11/25/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected entry (jah).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Submitting Motion re #297 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. Court determines, pursuant to its discretion under Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(1), the matter to be appropriate for resolution without oral argument. Court submits #297 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on the papers, and vacates the 12/16/2019 motion hearing. Any opposition is due by 12/2/2019. Any reply is due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/21/2019. (jah)
November 21, 2019 Filing 299 REPLY to Response to Motion re #290 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Apple, Inc.. (Cappella, Anne). (jah).
November 18, 2019 Filing 298 RESPONSE to Motion re #290 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mirzaie, Reza). (jah).
November 18, 2019 Filing 297 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Auyang, Heather). (jah).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER Submitting Motions. Pursuant to its discretion under Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(1), Court determines the matters to be appropriate for resolution without oral argument and submits #290 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #291 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, and #293 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on the papers, and vacates all the motion hearings. Any opposition to the motions is due by 11/18/2019. Any reply is due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/13/2019. (jah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 295 NOTICE in Support re #291 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Chachkes, Alex) .Modified on 11/12/2019 - Extra text added in all caps. QC Email sent. Corrected text (jah).
November 8, 2019 Filing 294 NOTICE Regarding #290 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Apple, Inc. (Cappella, Anne). (jah).
October 30, 2019 Filing 293 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities) (Nilsson, John). (jah).
October 25, 2019 Filing 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Upshaw, Everett). (jah).
October 18, 2019 Filing 291 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Chachkes, Alex). (jah).
October 17, 2019 Filing 290 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Apple Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Cappella, Anne). Modified on 10/21/2019 - Edited attachment description (jah).
October 7, 2019 Filing 289 Joint Status Report by Apple, Inc. re #287 Order Dismissing Case, #281 Status Report . (Cappella, Anne) Modified text on 10/8/2019, QC mail sent re wrong event, instructed not to re-file (rmc).
January 16, 2018 Filing 288 REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing Regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 5,850,482 (Re: Doc. No. #287 ORDER Administratively Closing the Consolidated Action)(cc: USPTO) (jrd)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER Administratively Closing the Consolidated Action. Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk to administrative close Consolidated Case No. 16-cv-385 and Member Case Nos. 16-cv-386, 16-cv-394, 16-cv-395, and 16-cv-396, and Related Case No. 16-cv-2499. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/16/2018. (jjg) (sjt).
January 16, 2018 Filing 286 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/16/2018. The Court will issue an order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Marc A. Fenster). (Defendant Attorney Brian E. Ferguson (Apple); Alex Chachkes (LG); Nicholas Lee (Samsung); Timothy Horton (ZTE); Peter Wied (Huawei)). (no document attached) (smy)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. [Doc. No. #284 ] Attorney Sara J. O'Connell; Sanjay Bhandari and Edward Chang terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/8/2018. (jjg)
January 8, 2018 Filing 284 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Sanjay Bhandari, Sara J. O'Connell, and Edward Chang by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward Chang)(Chang, Edward) (jjg).
January 4, 2018 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Timothy Alan Horton on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Horton, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Alan Horton added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Alan Horton added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:cc) (jjg).
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/16/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/20/2017.(jjg)
December 18, 2017 Filing 281 STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Written Decision for IPR2016-01179, #2 Exhibit Final Written Decision for IPR2016-01203)(Cappella, Anne) (jjg).
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Granting #279 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Court grants ZTE's motion and withdraws Daniel M. Benjamin as counsel of record for Defendant ZTE in Case Nos. 16-cv-385 and 16-cv-394. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/13/2017. (ag)
October 12, 2017 Filing 279 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Benjamin, Daniel) (ag).
October 12, 2017 Filing 278 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sanjay Bhandari (Bhandari, Sanjay) (ag).
October 12, 2017 Filing 277 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sara J. O'Connell (O'Connell, Sara) (ag).
October 12, 2017 Filing 276 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward Chang (Chang, Edward) (ag).
July 21, 2017 Filing 275 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Co-Pending Inter Partes Reviews by Apple, Inc.. (Ferguson, Brian) (ag).
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #273 Defendant LG Electronics Motion to Withdraw Catrina Wang as counsel in Case Nos. 16-cv-385 and 16-cv-386.. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/06/2017. (jpp)
June 5, 2017 Filing 273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Catrina Wang as Pro Hac Vice Counsel by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Chachkes, Alex) (jpp).
January 30, 2017 Filing 272 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 1/23/2017, before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. (akr)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Minute ORDER: In light of the Court's order granting the Defendants' motion to stay the case pending inter partes review (Doc. No. #269 ), the Court vacates all remaining pending hearing dates. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/25/2017. (no document attached) (smy)
January 23, 2017 Filing 270 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2017 regarding the motions to stay. The Court grants the motions to stay and will issue a written order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Marc A. Fenster and Reza Mirzaie). (Defendant Attorney Brian E. Ferguson (Apple); Sara J. O'Connell (ZTE); Vincent K. Yip (Huawei); Catrina Wang (LG) by telephone; John E. Nilsson (Samsung) by telephone). (no document attached) (smy)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER (1) Granting Defendants' #217 , #221 , #222 , #225 and #226 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review; and (2) Denying without Prejudice as Moot the Parties' #223 , #237 , #241 , #244 and #255 Motions to Strike. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/23/2017. (ag)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Catrina Wang. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/17/2017.(aef)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to John E. Nilsson. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/17/2017.(aef)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Minute ORDER: A hearing on Defendants' motion to stay is currently scheduled for Monday, January 23, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for the parties may appear at the hearing by telephone. If counsel decides to appear at the hearing by telephone, they must provide chambers with the necessary telephone numbers for the hearing by Friday. January 20, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/18/2017. (no document attached) (smy)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting Defendants' #238 Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #245 Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #247 Motion to Seal, and #256 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Court continues the hearing on the Parties' Motions to Strike to 2/13/2017 10:30 AM. Court grants Dfts' motions to file under seal without prejudice to the Court modifying this Order at a later time. The Clerk is directed to file the proposed document under seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/17/2017. (jah). Modified on 1/17/2017 - Motion to File Under Seal #243 withdrawn by filer per ECF #258 (jah).
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting Defendant Apple, Inc.'s #252 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Court grants the motion without prejudice to the Court modifying this Order at a later time. The Clerk is directed to file the proposed documents under seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/17/2017. (jah)
January 17, 2017 Filing 258 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by ZTE (USA) Inc. re #243 MOTION for Leave to File ZTE Gottesman Report Under Seal filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. . (Dykema, Erik) (ag).
January 12, 2017 Filing 257 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/17/2017] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #256 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Lee, Nicholas) (sjt). Modified on 1/17/2017 - Added file date of lodgment (jah). (Main Document 257 replaced on 1/17/2017) (jah).
January 12, 2017 Filing 256 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lee, Nicholas) (sjt).
January 12, 2017 Filing 255 MOTION to Strike Previously Undisclosed Theories in Dr. Gottesman's Infringement Report by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nicholas H. Lee, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
January 12, 2017 Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion re #217 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Apple's Reply to its Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Ferguson, Brian) (ag).
January 12, 2017 Filing 253 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/17/2017] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #252 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ferguson, Brian). (jah). Modified on 1/17/2017 - Added filed date of lodgment (jah). (Main Document 253 replaced on 1/17/2017) (jah).
January 12, 2017 Filing 252 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferguson, Brian). (jah).
January 11, 2017 Filing 251 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9719916.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Reidy, Patrick) (aef).
January 11, 2017 Filing 250 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
January 11, 2017 Filing 249 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9718845.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wang, Catrina) (aef).
January 10, 2017 Filing 248 NOTICE of Signature Certification to Joint Stipulated Motion for an Order to Seal by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re #247 Joint MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re #241 MOTION to Strike Previously Undisclosed Theories in Dr. Gottesman's Report (Chachkes, Alex) (ag).
January 10, 2017 Filing 247 Joint MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re #241 MOTION to Strike Previously Undisclosed Theories in Dr. Gottesman's Report by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Chachkes, Alex)(QC mailer sent re: missing signature certification) (sjt).
January 9, 2017 Filing 246 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/17/2017] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Dykema, Erik) (kcm). Modified on 1/17/2017 - Added file date of lodgment (jah). (Main Document 246 replaced on 1/17/2017) (jah).
January 9, 2017 Filing 245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Dykema, Erik) (kcm).
January 9, 2017 Filing 244 MOTION to Strike Portions of Gottesman Report by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Dykema, Erik) (ag).
January 9, 2017 Filing 243 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT NO. #258 - MOTION for Leave to File ZTE Gottesman Report Under Seal by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dykema, Erik) (ag). Modified on 1/17/2017 to term motion and note that this document is withdrawn (ag).
January 9, 2017 Filing 242 RESPONSE in Opposition re #217 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Christian W. Conkle, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Mirzaie, Reza) (ag).
January 9, 2017 Filing 241 MOTION to Strike Previously Undisclosed Theories in Dr. Gottesman's Report by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.'s Motion to Strike Previously Undisclosed Theories in Dr. Gottesman's Report, #2 Declaration of Catrina Wang, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Chachkes, Alex) (ag). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/17/2017) (jah). Modified on 1/17/2017 - Attachment #3 ordered sealed per 1/17/2017 Order #261 (jah).
January 9, 2017 Filing 240 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nilsson, John) (aef).
January 6, 2017 Filing 239 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/17/2017] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #238 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ferguson, Brian). (jah). Modified on 1/17/2017 - Added filed date of lodgment (jah). (Main Document 239 replaced on 1/17/2017) (jah).
January 6, 2017 Filing 238 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferguson, Brian). (jah).
January 6, 2017 Filing 237 NOTICE of Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Gottesmans's Expert Report by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of the Motion to Strike, #2 Declaration of C. Marando, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Ferguson, Brian) Modified on 1/9/2017-to set motion (aef).
January 6, 2017 Filing 236 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9706850.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nilsson, John) Notified attorney re missing signature; refile (aef).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Granting #233 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Microsoft Mobile with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/5/2017. (ag)
January 4, 2017 Filing 234 RESPONSE re #227 Order Seeking Clarification filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Dykema, Erik) (ag).
January 4, 2017 Filing 233 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Microsoft Mobile Inc with Prejudice by FastVDO LLC. (Conkle, Christian) (ag).
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting Samsung's #228 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/3/2017. (ag)
January 3, 2017 Filing 231 RESPONSE re #227 Order Seeking Clarification of Defendants' Positions filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.. (Wied, Peter) (ag).
January 3, 2017 Filing 230 RESPONSE re #227 Order Seeking Clarification of Defendants' Positions filed by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Chachkes, Alex) (ag).
January 3, 2017 Filing 229 Response to Order Seeking Clarification of Defendants' Positions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #227 Order (Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
December 30, 2016 Filing 228 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nicholas Lee, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Seeking Clarification of Defendant's Positions. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/28/2016.(ag)
December 28, 2016 Filing 226 NOTICE of Joinder by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. re #217 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (Wied, Peter) (ag).
December 28, 2016 Filing 225 MOTION to Stay re #217 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Notice of ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion for Joinder in Apple Inc.'s Motion to Stay Pending IPR by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Dykema, Erik) (ag).
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Denying Defendant Samsung's #213 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/28/16. (dlg)
December 27, 2016 Filing 223 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Delp Report Regarding (1) Undisclosed Written Description Theories and (2) Undisclosed Prior Art by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christian W. Conkle, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Conkle, Christian) (ag).
December 27, 2016 Filing 222 MOTION for Joinder in Apple Inc.'s Motion to Stay Pending Inter Parties Review by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Chachkes, Alex) (ag).
December 23, 2016 Filing 221 NOTICE of Joinder by Samsung Electronics America, Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #217 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
December 23, 2016 Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re #213 MOTION to Strike Document Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Oded Gottesman Pursuant to Rule 37(C) filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Wang Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Wang, Philip) (ag).
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER denying #218 Motion for Expedited Briefing and Shortened Hearing on Apple's Motion to Stay Pending IPR. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/22/2016. (fth)
December 21, 2016 Filing 218 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Apple, Inc.. (Ferguson, Brian) (fth).
December 21, 2016 Filing 217 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Anne Cappella, #3 Exhibit Apple's IPR Petition, #4 Exhibit Microsoft and Samsung's IPR Petition, #5 Exhibit IPR2016-01203 Institution, #6 Exhibit IPR2016-01179 Institution, #7 Exhibit PTAB IPR Statistics)(Ferguson, Brian) (fth).
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Minute ORDER: On December 20, 2016, the Court held a telephonic hearing regarding Samsung's pending motion to strike the supplemental expert report of Dr. Oded Gottesman regarding Samsung's infringement. Philip Wang appeared for Plaintiff FastVDO. John E. Nilsson appeared for Defendant Samsung. The Court takes the motion to strike under submission. As discussed at the hearing, Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to strike must be filed by December 23, 2016, and Defendant Samsung's reply, if any, must be filed by December 27, 2016. Defendant Samsung's rebuttal infringement expert report is due by January 3, 2017. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/20/2016. (no document attached) (smy)
December 20, 2016 Filing 215 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2016 re #213 MOTION to Strike Document Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Oded Gottesman Pursuant to Rule 37(C) filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. The Court submits the motion. Plaintiff's response due by 12/23/2016. Defendant Samsung's optional reply due by 12/27/2016. The Court will issue an order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Philip X. Wang). (Defendant Attorney John E. Nilsson (Samsung) and Craig L. Uhrich (ZTE)). (no document attached) (smy)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Minute ORDER: On December 19, 2016, Defendant Samsung filed a motion to strike the first supplemental expert report of Dr. Oded Gottesman regarding Samsung's infringement. (Doc. No. #213 .) The Court schedules a telephonic hearing regarding Defendant Samsung's motion to strike for December 20, 2016 at 2;30 p.m. The Court will initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/20/2016. (no document attached) (smy)
December 19, 2016 Filing 213 MOTION to Strike Document Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Oded Gottesman Pursuant to Rule 37(C) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nicholas Lee, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #211 Motion for Extension of Deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendant Microsoft Mobile. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/12/2016. (fth)
December 9, 2016 Filing 211 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines in FastVDO LLC v. Microsoft Mobile Inc. Pending Settlement Negotiations by Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Byer, Benjamin) (fth).
November 21, 2016 Filing 210 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw by FastVDO LLC re #209 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Philip X. Wang (Wang, Philip) (ag).
November 18, 2016 Filing 209 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Philip X. Wang by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip) (ag). Modified on 11/21/2016 to note that this motion is being withdrawn; terming motion (ag).
November 17, 2016 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara J. O'Connell on behalf of Microsoft Mobile Inc. (O'Connell, Sara)Attorney Sara J. O'Connell added to party Microsoft Mobile Inc.(pty:dft) (ag).
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/14/2016. (fth)
November 10, 2016 Filing 206 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #125 Scheduling Order,, Case Management Scheduling Order by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc) (fth).
November 3, 2016 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Arka D. Chatterjee on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Chatterjee, Arka)Attorney Arka D. Chatterjee added to party FastVDO LLC(pty:pla) (ag).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Minute Order. The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 11/1/2016 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/28/2016. (ag)
October 28, 2016 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 10/28/2016. Mr. Christian Conkle and Mr. Reza Mirzaie appeared on behalf of Plaintiff FastVDO. Ms. Sara O'Connell and Mr. Everett Upshaw appeared on behalf of Defendant ZTE Corporation.(no document attached) (ja1)
October 28, 2016 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip X Wang on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Wang, Philip)Attorney Philip X Wang added to party FastVDO LLC(pty:pla) (ag).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Granting #194 Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/21/2016. (dls)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Granting #190 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc. without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/21/2016. (ag) (jao).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER on #172 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The Court sustains Plaintiff's objections to Defendant's RPD Nos. 10, 31, 42, 48, and 57. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/20/2016. (dls)
October 18, 2016 Filing 196 REDACTION FastVDO -- Markman Slides Used at Hearing - FINAL [redacted] by Samsung Electronics America, Inc, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
October 18, 2016 Filing 195 *FILED UNDER SEAL (Per Order No. 200) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #194 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lee, Nicholas)(dls). (Main Document 195 replaced on 10/21/2016; modified docket text accordingly) (dls).
October 18, 2016 Filing 194 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lee, Nicholas) (dls).
October 17, 2016 Filing 193 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Claims Construction Hearing) held on 10/14/2016, before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. (akr)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/14/2016.(ag)
October 14, 2016 Filing 191 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Claims Contruction Hearing held on 10/14/2016. The Court submits the matter and will issue a written order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Mark A. Fenster, Christian W. Conkle). (Defendant Attorney Defendant Apple: Brian E. Ferguson, Christopher Marando, Anne M. Cappella, Marc Breverman; Defendant Samsung: John E. Nilsson, Nicholas H. Lee, Patrick Reidy; Defendant LG: Christopher J. Seibens, Alex V. Chachkes; Defendant ZTE: Sara J. OConnell, Everett Upshaw, Erik Dykema; Defendant Huawei: Peter J. Wied; Defendant Microsoft: Eric S. Walters; Defendant AT&T: Christopher W. Kennerly). (no document attached) (smy)
October 14, 2016 Filing 190 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc. by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) (ag).
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/12/2016.(ag)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting #186 Motion for Order Permitting Entry and Use of Electronic Equipment. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/11/2016. (cc: USMS) (ag)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Granting #181 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney David A Bailey terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/11/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jao).
October 10, 2016 Filing 186 Joint MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom by Apple, Inc.. (Ferguson, Brian) (ag).
October 7, 2016 Filing 185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/7/2016 with Defendant Huawei.(no document attached) (ja1)
October 5, 2016 Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/5/2016 with Defendant Samsung Electronics.(no document attached) (ja1)
October 5, 2016 Filing 183 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/5/2016 with Defendant LG Electronics.(no document attached) (ja1)
October 5, 2016 Filing 182 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/5/2016.(no document attached) (ja1)
October 4, 2016 Filing 181 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David A. Bailey and to terminate ECF notifications by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Upshaw, Everett) (ag).
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #179 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Court continues the Early Neutral Evaluation from 10/3/2016 to 11/1/2016 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/28/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
September 26, 2016 Filing 179 Joint MOTION to Continue ENE Hearing by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice Of Motion to Continue ENE Hearing re ZTE and FastVdo, and COS, #2 Declaration ISO Motion to Continue ENE Hearing re ZTE and FastVdo, and COS)(O'Connell, Sara)Attorney Sara Jean O'Connell added to party ZTE Corporation(pty:dft) (ag).
September 26, 2016 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jean O'Connell on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (O'Connell, Sara)Attorney Sara Jean O'Connell added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Jean O'Connell added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:cc) (ag).
September 22, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter Wied (Wied, Peter) (ag).
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Minute Order: The date and time of the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference on 10/06/2016 at 8:30 AM is vacated and reset for 10/06/2016 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/21/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #170 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/20/2016. (cxl)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER: (1) Granting #168 Joint Motion for Protective Order (2) Stiplulated Protective Order Regarding Intel Code Production. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/16/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
September 15, 2016 Filing 172 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute re #171 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #170 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher Marando, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 14)(Ferguson, Brian) (ag).
September 15, 2016 Filing 171 FILED UNDER SEAL ON 9/20/2016. SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #170 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ferguson, Brian) (dls). (Main Document 171 replaced on 9/20/2016) (cxl). Modified on 9/20/2016 to add lodgment filing date (cxl).
September 15, 2016 Filing 170 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Ferguson, Brian) (dls).
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin J. Byer. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/9/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 9, 2016 Filing 168 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liao, Jeffrey) (knb).
September 2, 2016 Filing 167 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9381713.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Byer, Ben)(aef).
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER On Joint Motion For Determination Of Discovery Dispute (Dkt #155 ): The Court overrules Apple's objections and orders Apple to respond to RPD request Nos. 1, 2-4, 11, 12, 29-40, and 50-54 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/31/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: (1) Granting #159 Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal; and (2) Directing the Clerk to File the Proposed Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/25/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dls)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER for Discovery Dispute Regarding Plaintiff's Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/22/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
August 19, 2016 Filing 162 RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by FastVDO LLC. (Fenster, Marc) (ag).
August 19, 2016 Filing 161 RESPONSE re #157 Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration)(Ferguson, Brian) (ag).
August 19, 2016 Filing 160 *FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/25/2016* SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #159 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Ferguson, Brian) (Modified on 8/25/2016 to replace image; modified docket text accordingly) (dls).
August 19, 2016 Filing 159 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferguson, Brian)(dls).
August 5, 2016 Filing 158 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Apple, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Microsoft Mobile Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas H. Lee, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nicholas H. Lee's Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Nicholas H. Lee's Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Nicholas H. Lee's Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Nicholas H. Lee's Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Nicholas H. Lee's Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Nicholas H. Lee's Declaration, #8 Declaration Declaration of Dr. Michael Kotzin, #9 Declaration Declaration of Dr. Nikil Jayant)(Lee, Nicholas) (ag).
August 5, 2016 Filing 157 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Zeger, #2 Declaration of Reza Mirzaie, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Mirzaie, Reza) (ag).
August 2, 2016 Filing 156 DECLARATION re #155 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re Apple's Responses to Fastvdo's First Common Set of Requests for Production by Plaintiff FastVDO LLC. (Conkle, Christian) (ag).
August 2, 2016 Filing 155 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re Apple's Responses to Fastvdo's First Common Set of Requests for Production by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Conkle, Christian) (ag)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Following Discovery Conference: A telephonic discovery conference was held on 7/27/2016. The parties shall call chambers to report no later than 8/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/27/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
July 27, 2016 Filing 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 7/27/2016(Plaintiff Attorney Christian Conkle). (Defendant Attorney Chris Marando, Brian Ferguson, Patrick Reidy, John Nilsson, Chris Siebens, Erik Dykema, Lindsey White, Dan Robinson). (no document attached) (jsb)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Setting Discovery Conference: The Court will hold a telephonic discovery conference on 7/27/2016 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/26/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER (1) Granting Joint Motion For Protective Order (Dkt #149 ) (2) Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding The Disclosure And Use Of Discovery Materials. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/25/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jao).
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER (1) Granting Joint Motion For ESI Order (Dkt #149 ) (2) Stipulated ESI Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/25/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jao).
July 22, 2016 Filing 149 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and ESI Order by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liao, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2016 Filing 148 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Chart, #2 Joint Claim Construction Worksheet)(Fenster, Marc) (ag).
June 28, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE of Change of Address by Everett McClyde Upshaw (Upshaw, Everett) (ag).
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting Joint #145 Motion for Protective Order as to Qualcomm; Stipulated Protective Order Between Non Party Qualcomm Incorporated, Plaintiff, and All Defendants. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/28/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
June 24, 2016 Filing 145 Joint MOTION for Protective Order as to Qualcomm Incorporated by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liao, Jeffrey) (ag).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting #143 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/23/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
June 22, 2016 Filing 143 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart, Joint Claim Construction Worksheet and Joint Hearing Statement and for Plaintiff to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions by Microsoft Mobile Inc.. (Walters, Eric) (ag).
May 9, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE of Subpoena to Qualcomm Incorporated by FastVDO LLC (Attachments: #1 AO-88B, #2 Attachment A)(Liao, Jeffrey) (ag).
May 9, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE of Subpoena to Intel Corporation by FastVDO LLC (Attachments: #1 AO-88B, #2 Attachment A)(Liao, Jeffrey) (ag).
May 9, 2016 Filing 139 NOTICE of Subpoena to Broadcom Corporation by FastVDO LLC (Attachments: #1 AO-88B, #2 Attachment A)(Liao, Jeffrey) (ag).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. This ENE will involve Plaintiff and the ZTE Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/4/2016.(nbp) (jao).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/5/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. This ENE will involve Plaintiff and the Samsung Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/4/2016.(nbp) (jao).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/6/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. This ENE will involve Plaintiff and the LG Electronics Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/4/2016.(nbp)(jao).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. This ENE will involve Plaintiff and the Huawei Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/4/2016.(nbp) (jao).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/5/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. This ENE will involve Plaintiff and the AT&T Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/4/2016.(nbp) (jao).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/6/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. This ENE will involve Plaintiff and Defendant Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/4/2016.(nbp) (jao).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Dismissing Action Against NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/29/2016. (ag) (jao).
April 27, 2016 Filing 131 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation of Dismissal by FastVDO LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (ag).
April 22, 2016 Filing 142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/22/2016(Plaintiff Attorney Marc Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, Christian Conkle). (Defendant Attorney Eric Walters, Erica Wilson, Mark Taylor). (no document attached) (jsb)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Continuing Dates for NEC Corporation of America. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/15/2016.(ag)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Megan H. Wantland. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/14/2016.(aef)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Setting Schedule for Settlement. The Court held a Status Conference on 04/11/2016. On or before 06/03/2016, the parties shall file a joint motion to dismiss this action in its entirety and with prejudice. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 6/7/2016 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. If the joint motion to dismiss is filed by 06/03/2016, then the disposition conference will automatically go off calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 04/12/2016.(ag)
April 12, 2016 Filing 127 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8965849.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wantland, Megan) (aef).
April 11, 2016 Filing 126 Joint NOTICE of Settlement by FastVDO LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (ag).
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: A Claims Construction Hearing is set for 10/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 2/10/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/3/2017. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/17/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. A Status Conference is set for 3/24/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Jury Trial is set for 3/28/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Court will not modify the dates and times set forth in this order except for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/5/2016.(nbp) (jao).
April 4, 2016 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/4/2016. The Court will issue a written order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorneys Reza Mirzaie and Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao). (Defendant Attorneys Lindsay M. White (AT&T); Anne Marie Cappella (Apple); Christopher Joseph Siebens (LG); Stuart Wesley Yother (NEC); Eric Stephen Walters (Microsoft); Everett McClyde Upshaw (ZTE); Ali R. Nicholas Sharifahmadian and Nicholas Hoyoung Lee (Samsung); Peter James Wied (Huawei)). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (smy)
April 1, 2016 Filing 123 Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Kennerly, Christopher) (ag).
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Converting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference to Status Conference. At the request of the parties, and for good cause, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference is converted to a telephonic status conference. The status conference will begin at 2:00 p.m. on April 11, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/1/2016.(nbp) (jao).
April 1, 2016 Filing 121 Joint NOTICE Regarding Proposed Changes to the Court's March 29, 2016 #116 Revised Tentative Scheduling Order by FastVDO LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc) (ag).
April 1, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE by FastVDO LLC re 119 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Docket No 119 (Fenster, Marc) (ag).
March 31, 2016 Filing 119 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT NO. #120 - NOTICE by FastVDO LLC re #116 Scheduling Order,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc)Sent QC email re missing atty signature (nbp) Modified on 4/4/2016 to note that this document is withdrawn (ag).
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart Wesley Yothers. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Musher. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: (1) Setting Telephonic Telephonic Case Management Conference; (2) Issuing Revised Tentative Scheduling Order. The Court issues the following revised tentative scheduling order and schedules a telephonic case management conference for Monday, April 4, 2016, at 3:30 p.m. Pacific time. The parties must meet and confer and, if necessary, jointly submit proposed changes to the tentative schedule on or before Friday, April 1, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Summary of Revised Tentative Scheduling Order)(nbp) (jao).
March 25, 2016 Filing 115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 3/25/2016. Discovery disputes are to be raised before the District Judge. The Court will then decide whether to address the matter or refer the discovery dispute to the Magistrate Judge. Scheduling order to follow. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Reza Mirzai; Christian Conkle; Jeffrey Liao). (Defendant Attorney Brian E. Ferguson; Linsday M. White; Christopher Merando). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (smy)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Application. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting #107 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr as AT & T's counsel terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2016. (ag)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting #102 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney John Frederick Bufe and William J. McCabe as NEC'S counsel terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2016. (ag)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting #97 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Michael E. Jones and John F. Bufe as Apple's counsel terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2016. (ag)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Application. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
March 17, 2016 Filing 109 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by FastVDO LLC JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN (Mirzaie, Reza) (ag).
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in: 16-CV-390-H (WVG), FASTVDO LLC v. NOKIA CORP., ET AL. An Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) in case number 16-cv-390-H (WVG), FastVDO LLC v. Nokia Corp., et al., will be held on 4/22/2016, at 9:00 AM, before United States Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/17/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
March 17, 2016 Filing 107 Unpposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Harry L. Gillam, Jr. by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) (ag).
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in 16-CV-389-H (WVG) FASTVDO LLC v. NEC CORP., ET AL. An Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) in case number 16-cv-389-H (WVG), FastVDO LLC v. NEC Corp., et al., will be held on 4/11/2016, at 2:00 PM, before United States Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/17/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
March 17, 2016 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance of Evan McLean by Evan M McLean on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (McLean, Evan) (ag).
March 17, 2016 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance of Lindsay White by Lindsay M White on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (White, Lindsay) (ag).
March 17, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance of Christopher W. Kennerly by Christopher W Kennerly on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Kennerly, Christopher) (ag).
March 16, 2016 Filing 102 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney William J. McCabe and John F. Bufe as counsel of record for NEC Corporation of America by NEC Corporation of America. (Fox, Maxwell) (ag).
March 14, 2016 Filing 101 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8883350.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Musher, Daniel) (aef).
March 11, 2016 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 3/11/2016(Plaintiff Attorney Reza Mirzai, Jeffrey Liao). (Defendant Attorney Chris Kennerly, Lindsey White, Brian Ferguson, Chris Marcando, Mark Breverman, Peter Wied, Chris Siebens, Stuart Yothers, Maxwell Fox, Eric Walters, Erica Wilson, Everett Upshaw). (no document attached) (jsb)
March 10, 2016 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by James S Blackburn on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Blackburn, James)Attorney James S Blackburn added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc(pty:cc), Attorney James S Blackburn added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James S Blackburn added to party Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.(pty:cc), Attorney James S Blackburn added to party Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(pty:dft) (ag).
March 8, 2016 Filing 98 NOTICE of Change of Address by Maxwell A. Fox (Fox, Maxwell) (ag)
March 7, 2016 Filing 97 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E Jones and John F. Bufe by Apple, Inc. (Cappella, Anne) (nbp)
March 4, 2016 Filing 96 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8855319.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Yothers, Stuart) (aef).
March 4, 2016 Filing 95 PRO HAC APPROVED: Everett McClyde Upshaw appearing for Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (aef)
March 4, 2016 Filing 94 PRO HAC APPROVED: Erik Dykema appearing for Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (aef)
March 3, 2016 Filing 93 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8853127.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Upshaw, Everett) (aef).
March 3, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell A. Fox on behalf of NEC Corporation of America (Fox, Maxwell) (ag).
March 3, 2016 Filing 91 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8853091.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dykema, Erik) (aef).
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher T. Marando. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/29/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Brian E. Ferguson. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/29/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 1, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Chang on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Chang, Edward)Attorney Edward Chang added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Chang added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:cc) (ag).
March 1, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjay Bhandari on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Bhandari, Sanjay)Attorney Sanjay Bhandari added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sanjay Bhandari added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:cc) (ag).
March 1, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Benjamin on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Benjamin, Daniel)Attorney Daniel M. Benjamin added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Benjamin added to party ZTE (USA) Inc.(pty:cc) (ag).
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting #84 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Charles Ainsworth and Robert Christopher Bunt terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/1/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
February 29, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Charles Ainsworth and Robert Christopher Bunt of the Law Firm Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C. by FastVDO LLC. (Fenster, Marc) (ag).
February 25, 2016 Filing 83 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 76 Electronic Transfer In. Mail sent to Maxwell A Fox. (srm)
February 25, 2016 Filing 82 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8830612.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Marando, Christopher) (aef).
February 25, 2016 Filing 81 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8830554.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Ferguson, Brian) (aef).
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Scheduling Status Conference. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/11/2016 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/23/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: (1) Setting Telephonic Case Management Conference (2) Issuing Tentative Scheduling Order. A telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 3/25/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Summary of Tentative Scheduling Order)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
February 23, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Marie Cappella on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Cappella, Anne) (ag).
February 18, 2016 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 16cv385-H(WVG) (no document attached) (tel)
February 17, 2016 Filing 75 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:15-cv-00921. Original file received electronically (kas) (jao).
February 11, 2016 Filing 76 Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of Texas. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (kas)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #70 Joint MOTION to Change Venue. ORDERED that the above- styled actions are transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Joseph Siebens on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Siebens, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Alex Verbin Chachkes on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Chachkes, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 2/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 4, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter James Wied on behalf of Futurewei Technologies Inc, Huawei Device Co Ltd, Huawei Device Co. Ltd, Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc, Huawei Technologies USA Inc (Wied, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 4, 2016 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dkts. 38, 39 and 40 by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik J Dykema on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Dykema, Erik) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 2, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian W Conkle on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Conkle, Christian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 1, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Dilworth Wilson on behalf of Microsoft Mobile Inc. (Wilson, Erica) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 1, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Stephen Walters on behalf of Microsoft Mobile Inc. (Walters, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
February 1, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Douglas McCabe on behalf of Microsoft Mobile Inc. (McCabe, Brent) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Wesley Yothers on behalf of NEC Corporation of America (Yothers, Stuart) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Lee on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Lee, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jin-Suk Park on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Park, Jin-Suk) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ali R Sharifahmadian on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Sharifahmadian, Ali) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-00921. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/28/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 22, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Stay filed by Apple, Inc.. (Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 22, 2016 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher T. Marando, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 22, 2016 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Change Venue and Joinder in Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher)[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 12, 2016 Filing 54 [SEALED] NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT 4 TO #47 DECLARATION OF REZA MIRZAIE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF FASTVDO LLCS OPPOSITION TO #38 DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Mirzaie, Reza)[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (kas). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2016: #1 Sealed Exhibit 4) (kas).
January 12, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE WITH COVER PAGE AND CERTIFICATES THAT ARE REQUIRED Document # 48, Sealed Additional attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 11, 2016 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Change Venue and Joinder in Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Reza Mirzaie, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Declaration of Christopher Martens, #11 Declaration of James Meany, #12 Declaration of Pankaj Topiwala)(Mirzaie, Reza)[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 11, 2016 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Stay filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 11, 2016 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Change Venue DECLARATION OF PANKAJ TOPIWALA filed by FastVDO LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 11, 2016 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Change Venue DECLARATION OF JAMES MEANY filed by FastVDO LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 11, 2016 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Change Venue DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER MARTENS filed by FastVDO LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 11, 2016 Filing 48 ***FILED IN ERROR***SEALED EXHIBIT 4 to #47 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion #38 MOTION to Change Venue ,. (Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 1/12/2016 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
January 11, 2016 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Change Venue DECLARATION OF REZA MIRZAIE filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5)(Mirzaie, Reza)[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
January 11, 2016 Filing 46 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #38 MOTION to Change Venue filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (kas). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (kas).
January 11, 2016 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Seal ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT APPLE, INCS MOTION TO TRANSFER by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1)(Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/14/2015. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
December 14, 2015 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Change Venue and Joinder in Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
December 10, 2015 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2015: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
November 30, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by FastVDO LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
November 24, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION to Change Venue and Joinder in Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
November 23, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
November 23, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION to Change Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Christopher T. Marando, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25)(Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
November 2, 2015 Filing 37 ANSWER to #35 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by FastVDO LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
November 2, 2015 Filing 36 ANSWER to #34 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by FastVDO LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
October 16, 2015 Filing 35 AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S AND AT&T SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against FastVDO LLC by AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC.(Kennerly, Christopher)[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
October 16, 2015 Filing 34 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against FastVDO LLC by Apple, Inc..(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
October 16, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/14/2015. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 28, 2015 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Apple, Inc., filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '482 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 23, 2015 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willfulness and Pre-Suit Inducement by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 9, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Evan M McLean on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5381033. (McLean, Evan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 9, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay M White on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5380913. (White, Lindsay) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 8, 2015 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Corporate Parent AT&T Teleholdings, Inc. for AT&T Services, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 8, 2015 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC. - Delaware limited liability company, Corporate Parent SBC Tower Holdings LLC - Delaware limited liability company for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 8, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willfulness and Pre-Suit Inducement by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp)
September 8, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Wood Kennerly on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 8, 2015 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 8, 2015 Filing 23 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
September 8, 2015 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against FastVDO LLC by Apple, Inc..(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
August 31, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher T Marando on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5366916. (Marando, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
August 31, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Cappella on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Cappella, Anne) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
August 31, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian E Ferguson on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, AT&T Mobility LLC answer due 9/8/2015; AT&T Services, Inc. answer due 9/8/2015; Apple, Inc. answer due 9/8/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/5/2015. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
August 3, 2015 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nbp).
July 9, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 8/7/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
July 2, 2015 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 25, 2015 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Services, Inc..( Gillam, Harry) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 25, 2015 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Mobility LLC.( Gillam, Harry) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 25, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Mobility LLC to 8/7/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
June 25, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Services, Inc. to 8/7/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
June 23, 2015 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FastVDO LLC. Apple, Inc. served on 6/17/2015, answer due 7/8/2015. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 23, 2015 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FastVDO LLC. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 6/17/2015, answer due 7/8/2015. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 23, 2015 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FastVDO LLC. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 6/17/2015, answer due 7/8/2015. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 9, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shani M Tutt on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Tutt, Shani) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 9, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Liao, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 5, 2015 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 AT&T Mobility LLC, #2 AT&T Services Inc)(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp)
June 3, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 3, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Fenster, Marc) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 3, 2015 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FastVDO LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 3, 2015 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FastVDO LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 3, 2015 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/3/2015. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp).
June 3, 2015 Case assigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
June 3, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.]
June 2, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5226251.), filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '482 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/17/2016.] (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FastVDO LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FastVDO LLC
Represented By: Shani M Tutt
Represented By: Christian W Conkle
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Arka D. Chatterjee
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Christopher W Kennerly
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Evan M McLean
Represented By: Lindsay M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Device Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Peter Wied
Represented By: Heather F. Auyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE Corporation
Represented By: Sara J. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Maxwell A. Fox
Represented By: Stuart Wesley Yothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Erik Dykema
Represented By: Timothy Alan Horton
Represented By: Sara J. O'Connell
Represented By: Daniel M. Benjamin
Represented By: Everett McClyde Upshaw
Represented By: Sanjay Bhandari
Represented By: Edward Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Wied
Represented By: Heather F. Auyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Kennerly
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Evan M McLean
Represented By: Lindsay M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Wied
Represented By: Heather F. Auyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Jin-Suk Park
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Represented By: James S. Blackburn
Represented By: John E. Nilsson
Represented By: Ali R. Sharifahmadian
Represented By: Nicholas H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Jin-Suk Park
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Represented By: James S. Blackburn
Represented By: John E. Nilsson
Represented By: Ali R. Sharifahmadian
Represented By: Nicholas H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. Ferguson
Represented By: Anne Marie Cappella
Represented By: Megan H. Wantland
Represented By: Daniel Musher
Represented By: Christopher T. Marando
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futurewei Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Wied
Represented By: Heather F. Auyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Alex Chachkes
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Siebens
Represented By: Catrina Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Mobile Inc.
Represented By: Eric Stephen Walters
Represented By: Benjamin J. Byer
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Dan Robinson
Represented By: Erica Dilworth Wilson
Represented By: Brent Douglas McCabe
Represented By: Sara J. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Alex Chachkes
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Siebens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Peter Wied
Represented By: Heather F. Auyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Represented By: James S. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Represented By: James S. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Represented By: Peter Wied
Represented By: Heather F. Auyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?