H.I.S.C, Inc. et al v. Franmar International Importers, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: H.I.S.C, Inc. and DePalma Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Franmar International Importers, Ltd., Maria Rajanayagam and Ravi Industries Limited
Case Number: 3:2016cv00480
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER on Motions 260 , 261 for (1) Treble Damages, (2) Attorney's Fees. Defendants Motion for Treble Damages is Denied. Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is Granted In Part. The Court awards Defendants $133,988.50 in attorney's fees and $12,942.11 in costs and expenses. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/22/2020. (mme) Modified on 10/23/2020 to correct filed date (mme).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER Denying 255 Counterclaimant's Motion to Modify or Clarify the Injunction. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/23/2020. (mme)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial [Doc. 223 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/8/2019. (anh)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER on Motions in Limine and Motions to Seal: denying 140 Motion to Preclude; granting 141 Motion to Preclude; denying 142 Motion to Preclude; denying 143 Motion to Preclude; denying 144 Motion to Preclude; denying 145 Motion to Preclud e; granting 146 Motion to Preclude; granting 147 Motion to Preclude; denying 148 Motion to Preclude; denying 149 Motion to Preclude; denying 150 Motion to Exclude; denying 151 Motion to Exclude; denying 152 Motion to Exclude; denying 153 Motion to Exclude; denying 154 Motion to Exclude; denying 155 Motion to Exclude; granting 156 Motion to Exclude; denying 157 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; denying 171 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/19/2018. (anh)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER : (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Denying Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions [Docket Nos. 99 , 102 , 103 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/10/2018. (anh)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Re: (1) Disputes Over Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' RFPs; and (2)Plaintiffs' Challenges to Third-Party QVC Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/7/2018.(anh)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Joint Motion to Continue; and Amended Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/6/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. In the e vent the case does not settle at the ENE Conference, the parties shall also be prepared to participate in a Case Management Conference. Telephonic attorneys-only Status Conference set for 8/21/2017 08:15 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/7/2017.(knb)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: (1) Denying Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss; and (2) Denying Plaintiffs'/Counterclaim Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/19/2016. (knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.I.S.C, Inc. et al v. Franmar International Importers, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.I.S.C, Inc.
Represented By: Anton N Handal
Represented By: Gabriel G. Hedrick
Represented By: Lauren Gail Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DePalma Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel G. Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franmar International Importers, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Rajanayagam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravi Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?