United States of America v. The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall, Amy Hedwig Hall, Union Bank N.A., Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation, California Coast Credit Union, T.D. Service Company, A & F Family Pure Trust, Michael Alan Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Steven Susko, FCI Lender Services, Inc. and Sally Dawn Cobb
Cross Claimant: Lawyers Title Company, Fidelity National Financial and MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A.
Cross Defendant: Estate of Frances V. Scott
3Rd Party Defendant: Fidelity National Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00538
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Cross-Complaint (Doc. No. #223 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/20/2021. (jrm)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Cross-Complaint by Russell Merton Hall and Amy Hedwig Hall, Trustees of the Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall. (Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER of USCA as to #206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall. Appellants' motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal is granted. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of the USCA. (akr)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Todd W. Robinson is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 16cv538TWR-BGS.(no document attached) (smd)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 3:16-cv-00538-TWR-BGS. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/06/2020.(jrm)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #196 Bill of Costs, filed by Estate of Frances V. Scott, A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott : Hearing set for 2/6/2020 is hereby VACATED in accordance with Order #218 . Case stayed until pending appeal.(no document attached) (jms)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Granting The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall, and Amy Hedwig Hall's Ex Parte Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Appeal (Doc. No. #213 ). Case stayed until pending appeal. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/31/2020. (jrm)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re #213 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Appeal filed by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alyssa B. Kiley in Support of Opposition to Motion to Stay Case)(Kiley, Alyssa) (mme).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 REPLY - Other re #205 Objection to Bill of Costs CORRECTION OF DOCKET #214 filed by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Kiley, Alyssa)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 re #196 Bill of Costs, Response to Bill of Costs Filed by Cross-Defendants. (Ragland, Karen)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 REPLY to Response to Motion re #202 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael Alan Scott. (Kiley, Alyssa)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Appeal by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Karen A. Ragland in Support)(Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing/Order to Show Cause) for date of 10/17/2019 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia re #206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeannette N. Hill. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2020. (akr)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing/Order to Show Cause) for date of 8/1/2019 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia re #206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeannette N. Hill. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2020. (akr)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, for proceedings held on 8/1/2019, 10/17/2019 re #206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. (Ragland, Karen). (akr).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 USCA Time Schedule Order as to #206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court (see attached), provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 1/3/2020 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 2/3/2020.) (cc: Court Reporter). (Attachments: #1 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form).(akr)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 USCA Case Number 19-56432 for #206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall. (akr)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #196 Bill of Costs, filed by Estate of Frances V. Scott, A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott : Hearing set for 12/11/2019 is hereby VACATED. Hearing set for 2/6/2020 at 10:00AM. Any opposition or responsive pleading due 1/30/2020. All parties are to appear telephonically for this Bill of Costs hearing and are directed to join on a conference call, then contact Jennifer Simmons - (619) 321-0251 at the time of the hearing. (no document attached) (jms) Modified on 12/4/2019 (jms).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to #195 Order by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-13231871.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Ragland, Karen). (Modified on 12/4/2019: Edited docket text re linked Order.) (akr).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Objection to Bill of Costs re #196 Bill of Costs, 197 Notice of Hearing - Bill of Costs, filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Bill of Costs and to Extend Time to File Opposition to Motion for Bill of Costs by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ragland, Karen)(jrm).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Kiley, Alyssa) (jrm).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION for Attorney Fees by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Lenden Webb, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Kiley, Alyssa) (jrm).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Notice of Request to continue Bill of Costs Dates by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen A. Ragland in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Ragland, Karen) (jms). Docket text updated, wrong event used (jms).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 (Ragland, Karen) (jms).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #198 MOTION for Attorney Fees , from Third Party Plaintiffs A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on..(sjt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #1 main doc, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1) (sjt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5) (sjt).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #199 ** MOTION for Attorney Fees by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Lenden Webb, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Kiley, Alyssa)(QC mailer sent re: motion missing time and date of hearing) (sjt). Modified to strike on 11/25/2019 (sjt). (sjt).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #196 Bill of Costs, filed by Estate of Frances V. Scott, A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott : Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00AM. Any opposition or responsive pleading due 12/4/2019. All parties are to appear telephonically for this Bill of Costs hearing and are directed to join on a conference call, then contact Jennifer Simmons - (619) 321-0251 at the time of the hearing. (no document attached) (jms)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 BILL OF COSTS submitted by Defendant A & F Family Pure Trust, Cross Defendants Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott in the amount of $ 3,371.25. Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Application, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lenden Webb, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kiley, Alyssa)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Order: (1) Denying Cross-Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. #181 ); (2) Denying Cross-Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Real Party in Interest (Doc. No. #178 ); and (3) Granting Judgment to the Scott Defendants. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/12/2019. (jrm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Minute Order for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Conference held on 10/18/2019 regarding rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. Counsel for the parties to jointly contact Judge Skomal's Chambers within 3 days of a ruling on the pending motions. (ECF 178, 181.) Counsel should meet and confer prior to contacting chambers and know all dates when counsel and the parties are all available appear in-person for the MSC. (Plaintiff Attorney Karen A. Ragland).(Defendant Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley). (no document attached) (rxa)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia:Motion Hearing/Order to Show Cause hearing held on 10/17/2019. Court takes matters under submission and will issue order. Submitting [178-1] Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party Real-Party-in-Interest, Submitting [181-1] Motion for Reconsideration of Order re: Summary Judgment.(Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney n/a ).(Defendant Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley, Karen A. Ragland). (no document attached) (ymm)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #181 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order re: Summary Judgment filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REPLY to Response to Motion re #178 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party Real-Party-in-Interest filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen A. Ragland, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration)(Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Cross-Claimants to Reply to Motion for Order Substituting Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company in This Action and to Motion for Reconsideration of Order Re: Summary Judgment Responses due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/29/2019. (jrm) (jao).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order re: Summary Judgment filed by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alyssa Kiley)(Kiley, Alyssa) (jrm).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Extension of Time served on David Michael Parker; Charles M. Duffy; Alyssa Brooke Kiley on August 28, 2019, filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall. (Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 183 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, Reply to Opposition to Motion for Order Substituting Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company in this Action and to Motion for Reconsideration of Order re: Summary Judgment by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall. (Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MINUTE ORDER re #173 Order on Motion to Continue: Telephonic Attorneys Only Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel shall jointly call (619) 557-2993 at 10:00 AM on 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/27/2019.(no document attached) (rxa)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 RESPONSE in Opposition re #178 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party Real-Party-in-Interest filed by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alyssa Kiley)(Kiley, Alyssa) (rmc).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Continued Hearing on Motion #178 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party Real-Party-in-Interest and OSC hearing : Motion Hearing is continued to 10/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (no document attached) (sc)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #181 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order re: Summary Judgment : Responses due by 8/29/2019; Replies due by 9/5/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing is scheduled for 10/17/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting re #181 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order re: Summary Judgment, from Cross Claimants Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Battaglia Civil Case Procedures: Chambers Rule II(G)(2), (3) counsel must file reconsideration motions as ex parte; motion cannot exceed ten (10) pages; no exhibits are allowed. Battaglia Civil Case Procedures: Chambers Rule III(1) counsel must contact the law clerk prior to filing an ex parte motion; counsel failed to file a declaration showing (1) her efforts to contact opposing counsel, (2) counsels meet and confer efforts, or (3) opposing counsels position regarding her ex parte motion. It is hereby ordered: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record.(jrm)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order re: Summary Judgment by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Karen A. Ragland, #3 Exhibit "1" to Declaration)(Ragland, Karen) (jrm).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #178 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party Real-Party-in-Interest: Opposition due by 8/20/2019. This motion will be discussed at the 9/12/19 OSC hearing. (no document attached) (sc)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party Real-Party-in-Interest by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Karen A. Ragland)(Ragland, Karen) (acc).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Denying #162 Cross-Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court DENIES their motion for summary judgment and GRANTS judgment to the Scott Defendants as to the third and eleventh causes of action. Furthermore, the Court ORDERS The Halls to show cause as to why their remaining cross-claim should not be dismissed for similar standing and damages issues, as well as the lack of any issue of fact that Michael Scott knew of the existence of the tax liens at the time of the sale. The evidence presented in the record to date is clearly to the contrary. The OSC hearing is set for 9/12/2019, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/2/2019. (acc)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2019, [162-1] Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues on Third and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Cross-Claim by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 - Submitted. Court takes matter under submission and will issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Defendant Attorney Leland Webb). (Alyssa Brooke Kiley, Karen A. Ragland).(no document attached) (ymm)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues on Third and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Cross-Claim : Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (no document attached) (sc)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Docketed in Error (Doc. No. 174). The motion for summary judgment (doc. no. 162 remains on calendar as previously scheduled, however, is moved up to 1:00 p.m. on that same day. (no document attached) (sc)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Motions Submitted #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues on Third and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Cross-Claim. This motion is suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the motion will be deemed submitted as of this date. (no document attached) (sc)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting #172 Joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference. The 7/22/2019 MSC is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/3/2019. (acc)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Joint MOTION to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) (acc).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Denying #167 Joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/25/2019. (acc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Continuing Final Trial Conference and Extending Pretrial Deadlines re #168 . Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/24/2019. (jrm) (jao).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues on Third and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Cross-Claim filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen)(acc).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) (acc).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Joint MOTION to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) (acc).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues on Third and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Cross-Claim filed by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration)(Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 Rule 26 Pretrial Disclosures. (Ragland, Karen) (acc).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott) Rule 26 Pretrial Disclosures. (Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Battaglia: Setting Briefing Schedule re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues on Third and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Cross-Claim : Responses due by 6/14/2019; Replies due by 6/21/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 8/1/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues on Third and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Cross-Claim by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues, #2 Declaration of Staci Ulrich in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues, #4 Notice of Lodgment of Relevant Excerpts from Transcript of Deposition of Amy Hedwig Hall in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues, #5 Notice of Lodgment of Relevant Excerpts from Transcript of Deposition of Michael Alan Scott in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues, #6 Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of the Issues)(Ragland, Karen)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting #160 Joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Mandatory Settlement Conference is continued to July 22, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Everyone required by the Courts April 10, 2019 Order, (ECF #157 1), must be present for the MSC. As indicated in that Order, failure of any required parties or counsel to appear at the MSC without the Courts permission will be grounds for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/22/2019. (tcf)(jrd)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Joint MOTION to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott), The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) (tcf).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Denying #158 Joint Motion to Excuse Personal Appearance of Required Parties at Mandatory Settlement Conference. All counsel and parties required by the Courts April 10, 2019 Order rescheduling the MSC, (ECF #157 1), must appear in-person for the MSC. If the parties elect in the alternative to seek a continuance of the MSC, they must do so as soon as possible and include all dates when everyone required for the MSC will be available to attend the MSC in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/20/2019. (tcf)(jrd)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Joint MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Staci Ulrich for Commonwealth and Michael Alan Scott at Mandatory Settlement Conference, by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, Michael Alan Scott, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) (acc).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: 1) Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference; and 2) Resetting Pretrial Deadlines: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/10/2019.(acc)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting #141 Cross-Defendant Sally Dawn Cobb's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court GRANTS Cobb's summary judgment motion in its entirety. (Doc. No. 141.) Cobb is hereby dismissed from the action. Per Judge Skomal's order, the parties are to call his chambers within three days from the date of this order to reschedule the mandatory settlement conference and pretrial dates. (Doc. No. 151.). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/29/2019. (acc)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 (Ragland, Karen) (acc).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2018 re [141-1] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sally Dawn Cobb. Court takes matter under submission and will issue order. Submitting [141-1] Motion for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney Karen A. Ragland (Cross Complaint)).(Defendant Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley, Leon J. Saad). (no document attached) (ymm)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Abstract of Judgment by United States of America, entered against Estate of Neil Alan Scott. (rmc)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment issued on 11/1/2018 as to Estate of Neil Alan Scott, by United States of America (rmc)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Granting in Part #149 Joint Motion to Continue Pretrial Dates and Reschedule Conference. The 10/31/2018 Mandatory Settlement Conference and the pretrial deadlines set forth in paragraphs 9-14 of the Amended Scheduling Order are VACATED. Counsel for the parties must jointly contact Judge Skomal's chambers within 3 court days of a ruling on the pending Motion for Summary Judgment to reschedule the MSC and have the pretrial deadlines reset. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/30/2018. (acc)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Estate of Neil Alan Scott, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Abstract of Judgment)(Duffy, Charles) QC re: must process in person within the Clerk's office (acc).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Dates and MSC by Sally Dawn Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Saad, Leon) QC re: proposed order (acc).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the motion hearing is hereby continued to 11/15/2018 at 2:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sally Dawn Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Saad, Leon) (acc).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Cross-Defendant Sally Cobb filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cross-Defendant Sally Cobb, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cross-Defendant Sally Cobb, #3 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Certified Depo Transcript of Sally Cobb, #4 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Certified Depo Transcript of Michael Alan Scott, #5 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Certified Depo Transcript of Amy Hall, #6 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Certified Depo Transcript of Paul Worthington)(Ragland, Karen) (acc).
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Joint Motion to Extend Response and Reply Dates and to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Cross-Defendant Sally Cobb Third Party Complaint. Responses due by 9/18/2018; Replies due by 9/25/2018. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/4/2018. (acc)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response And Reply and Continue Hearing on MSJ Document 141 by Sally Dawn Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Saad, Leon) (acc).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Sally Dawn Cobb re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibit Attachment #5 replace with corrected Table of Contents (Saad, Leon) (acc).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Responses due by 9/7/2018; Replies due by 9/14/2018; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 10/18/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sally Dawn Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sally Cobb, #2 Declaration Leon J Saad, #3 Notice Lodgment of exhibite 1 - 7, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Saad, Leon) (acc).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Cross-Defendant Sally Cobb's Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Leon J. Saad for Sally Dawn Cobb. Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley terminated. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/21/2018. (acc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Sally Dawn Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 (Ragland, Karen) (acc).
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER finding as moot #125 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #126 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, in light of the Court granting dismissal of the third party complaint. (no document attached) (sc)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Joint Motion to Dismiss by Stipulation of the Scott Defendants and Third Party Defendants of the Third Party Complaint Filed in this Case (ECF #109). The Third Party Complaint that Scott Defendants filed in this case (ECF #109) is hereby dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/17/2018. (acc)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by A & F Family Pure Trust, Sally Dawn Cobb, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Joint Motion to Extend #126 Third Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/17/2018, Replies due by 5/24/2018. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/5/2018. (acc)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Joint MOTION to Continue Motion to Dimiss hearing, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion to Dismiss Responsive Pleading Deadlines by A & F Family Pure Trust, Sally Dawn Cobb, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Motion to Vacate Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/31/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/21/2018. (sjt)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Joint MOTION to Vacate 130 Scheduling Conference, Set Hearings, Terminate Hearings, by A & F Family Pure Trust, Sally Dawn Cobb, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Joint Motion to Extend Third Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Responses now due by 4/9/2018. Replies now due by 4/16/2018. Motion Hearing continued to 6/28/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/9/2018. (acc)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Joint MOTION to Continue Motion to Dismiss (Doc 126) and All Accompanying Deadlines by A & F Family Pure Trust, Sally Dawn Cobb, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa)Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party A & F Family Pure Trust(pty:3pp), Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Estate of Frances V. Scott(pty:3pp), Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Estate of Neil Alan Scott(pty:3pp) (acc).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Minute Order for proceedings held with Chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Counsel for the parties jointly contacted Chambers on 3/8/2018 and jointly requested an earlier Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Court GRANTS the request and sets the MSC for 3/28/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. MSC briefs shall be submitted by 3/19/2018. All other requirements for the MSC set forth in the Court's February 20, 2018 Order shall be followed. (Defendant Attorney Karen A Ragland, Alyssa Brooke Kiley). (no document attached) (rxa)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #125 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Third Party Complaint, #126 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim With Points & Authorities : Responses due by 3/12/2018; Replies due by 3/19/2018; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 5/10/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim With Points & Authorities by Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Lawyers Title Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Ragland, Karen) Modified on 2/27/2018 to correct docket text. This is not a joint motion(acc).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Third Party Complaint by Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Lawyers Title Company. (Ragland, Karen)Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Fidelity National Financial, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Lawyers Title Company(pty:3pd) Modified on 2/26/2018 to correct docket text(acc).
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Joint Motion to Amend Order by Stipulation of the Scott Defendants and the United States (Doc. 116). The Order Granting Summary Judgment on the United States' first claim is Amended to enter Judgment against the Estate of Neil Alan Scott only, and not against any of the other Scott Defendants. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/23/2018. (acc)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Joint MOTION to Alter Judgment to Order Summary Judgment for the United States' First Claim against the Estate of Neil Alan Scott only by A & F Family Pure Trust, Sally Dawn Cobb, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Kiley, Alyssa)Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Estate of Neil Alan Scott(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Frances V. Scott(pty:dft) (acc).
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Joint Motion to Dismiss by Stipulation of the Scott Defendants and Cross-Claim Plaintiff, California Coast Credit Union from the Counter-Claim Filed in this Case. The Scotts are hereby dismissed from the Counter-Claim that CCCU filed in this case (ECF #44-1), with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. By this dismissal, the Counter-Claim that CCCU filed in this case (ECF #44-1) is fully dismissed and CCCU is eliminated as a party to this action as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/22/2018. (acc)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Scott Defendants as Counter-Claim Defendants by California Coast Credit Union. (Parker, David) Modified on 2/21/2018 to correct event type (acc).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/31/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/20/2018.(acc)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Fidelity National Financial, Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, Lawyers Title Company // Supplemental Joint Discovery Plan (Ragland, Karen)(acc).
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference and Requiring Supplement to Joint Discovery Plan. The supplemental joint statement must be filed by 2/12/2018. The 2/8/2018 Telephonic Case Management Conference is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/6/2018.(acc)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, Lawyers Title Company, Fidelity National Financial (Ragland, Karen)Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Lawyers Title Company(pty:crc), Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Fidelity National Financial(pty:crc)(acc).
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #54 United States' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court GRANTS the United States' motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, the Court enters judgment against the Scott Defendants in the amount of $7,172,194.66 as of 6/15/2017, on the assessments made against him for the tax years 1999, 2000, 2001, and 2002, plus interest and other additions as provided by law thereafter. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/30/2018. (acc)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER VACATING Telephonic Attorneys Only Status Conference set for 1/22/18 at 1:30 p.m. and setting new deadlines. Counsel shall meet and confer and file an updated Joint Discovery Plan by 2/5/2018. Counsel should be as specific as possible in identifying what, if any, discovery they need to complete based on the new pleadings. Telephonic Attorneys Only Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. In addition to setting any necessary deadlines to move the case forward, the Court will also discuss the appropriate time to hold a Mandatory Settlement Conference. Plaintiff's counsel to coordinate joint call to Chambers on 2/8/18 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/18/18.(no document attached) (rxa)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ANSWER to Amended Crossclaim by A & F Family Pure Trust, Sally Dawn Cobb, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa)Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party A & F Family Pure Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Estate of Frances V. Scott(pty:crd), Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Estate of Frances V. Scott(pty:crd), Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Estate of Neil Alan Scott(pty:crd), Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley added to party Estate of Neil Alan Scott(pty:crd)(acc).
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles)(acc).
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Summons Issued re #103 Amended CrossClaim. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #108 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley substituted as counsel of record for Sally Dawn Cobb and Michael Alan Scott in place of Attorney Robert E. Barnes. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/28/2017. (jah)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Summons on Third Party Complaint Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jah)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Lawyers Title Company, Fidelity National Financial, Inc., filed by Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott), Estate of Neil Alan Scott, A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Sally Dawn Cobb. New Summons Requested. (Kiley, Alyssa). (jah).
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Alyssa Brooke Kiley for Sally Dawn Cobb and Michael Alan Scott. Attorney Robert E. Barnes terminated. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/28/2017. (acc)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Sally Dawn Cobb, Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott), Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Michael Alan Scott, Sally Dawn Cobb, Michael Alan Scott . (Kiley, Alyssa) (acc).
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ***WITHDRAWN per #105 ***MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Michael Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott, Sally Dawn Cobb. (Kiley, Alyssa) Modified on 12/29/2017 (acc). Modified on 1/5/2018 (acc).
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED CROSSCLAIM against Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott, filed by The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall, Amy Hedwig Hall. (Ragland, Karen) QC re: s/ signature(acc).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #83 Motion to File a Third-Party Complaint; granting #98 Motion to File First Amended Cross-Claim. Both new pleadings must be filed by 12/29/2017. The 1/22/2018 MSC is converted to a telephonic, attorneys-only status conference with Judge Skomal. The rest of the scheduling order dates are hereby vacated and will be re-set at a later time. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/14/2017. (acc)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted #83 MOTION for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint, #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend. These motions are suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the motions will be deemed submitted as of this date. (no document attached) (sc)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Cross-Claim filed by Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott(in her Individual Capacity and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott), Michael Alan Scott(as Managing Trustee of the A & F Family Pure Trust and as de facto Personal Representative of the Estate of Neil Alan Scott). (Barnes, Robert)(acc).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #98 MOTION for leave to file first amended cross claimCross-Claim : Responses due by 12/1/2017; Replies due by 12/8/2017; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 1/18/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Cross-Claim by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen) QC re: s/ signature and motion hearing time/date on document(acc).
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #66 Joint Motion to Dismiss Claims Two through Five. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/9/2017. (acc)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 MOTION for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint filed by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Barnes, Robert)(acc).
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint // Opposition By Defendants And Cross-complainants The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001; Russell Merton Hall, As Trustee Of The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 And Amy Hedwig Hall, As Trustee Of The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 To Motion For Leave To File Third Party Complaint filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen)(acc).
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Joint Motion to Continue. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/26/2017. (acc)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint and Proposed Order by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Ragland, Karen)(acc).
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles) (lrf).
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #83 MOTION for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint: Responses due by 10/30/2017; Replies due by 11/6/2017; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing is scheduled for 12/7/17 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #86 Notice (Other), from Defendants Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, Cross Claimant MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), No provisions for acceptance. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/13/2017.(acc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (acc).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 10/24/2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2017.(acc)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #68 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party. BASED ON THE Stipulation (ECF #68) filed by the United States of America, the Plaintiff in this case, and Defendants the Hall Family Trust Dated 6/8/2001 (the Hall Trust), Russell Merton Hall and Amy Hedwig Hall as Trustees of the Hall Trust (the Halls), MUFG Union Bank N.A., formerly known as Union Bank, N.A. (Union Bank) and California Coast Credit Union (CCCU), the Hall Trust, the Halls, Union Bank and CCCU are hereby dismissed from the Amended Complaint filed in this case (ECF #34), with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2017. (acc)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #67 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party. The United States is hereby dismissed from the Counter-Claim that CCCU filed in this case (ECF #44-1), with prejudice with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2017. (acc)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ***STRICKEN per order #90 ***NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A. (Ragland, Karen)Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A.(pty:crc)(acc). (Main Document 86 replaced on 10/13/2017) (acc). Modified on 10/13/2017 (acc).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Karen A Ragland on behalf of Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall (Ragland, Karen)(acc).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney Filed September 26, 2017 by Russell Merton Hall re #69 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Sheri M Kanesaka (Kanesaka, Sheri) (acc).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint by Michael Alan Scott. (Barnes, Robert) (acc).
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Corey Spearman, re #76 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/5/2017.(kcm)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket the Sur-Reply attached to the Ex Parte Motion as Exhibit 78-1. (no document attached) (sc)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE // Report of Alan D. Wallace, Expert Witness and Credentials by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 (Ragland, Karen)Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Amy Hedwig Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Russell Merton Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001(pty:dft)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 // Supplemental Disclosures of Cross-Claimants. (Ragland, Karen)(acc).
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Surreply, #2 Declaration of Tony Nasser)(Barnes, Robert) QC re: atty acct and atty s/ signature(acc).
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10508646.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Spearman, Corey) (ajs).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: counsel contacted chambers on October 4, 2017 regarding a discovery dispute as to the timeliness and particularity of a subpoena (objection filed at ECF No. 74.) Counsel agreed that a brief extension of discovery to October 31, 2017 would resolve the timeliness issue and counsel expected the particularity issue would be resolved through an additional meet and confer. Accordingly, the Court extends the fact discovery deadline for purposes of this subpoena only to October 31, 2017. The fact discovery deadline otherwise remains October 6, 2017 and no other deadlines in the scheduling order are modified. If counsel is unable to resolve the particularity issue through further meet and confer efforts, counsel must jointly contact chambers on or before October 16, 2017 to raise the issue. (Defendant Attorney Tony Nasser, Karen A Ragland). (no document attached) (rxa)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing: As required by the Court's July 28, 2017 Order, on September 7, 2017 the parties filed joint motions to dismiss the claims that have been settled in this case. Accordingly, the October 10, 2017 Settlement Disposition Conference that was set to address dismissal of those claims is VACATED. (no document attached) (rxa)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OBJECTION by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A. to Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action upon Lawyers Title Company. (Ragland, Karen)(acc).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Larry Alan Burns is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 16cv0538-AJB-BGS. The hearing set before the Judge Larry Alan Burns on Tuesday, October 10, 2017 is vacated. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/3/2017.(lrf) Modified on 10/3/2017 to update docket text (lrf).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DECLARATION of Charles M. Duffy Regarding the Scott Defendants' Failure to Meet and Confer by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Charles)(acc).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Second and Fourth Claims in the Amended Complaint and on the Counter-Claim Filed by California Coast Credit Union filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Charles)(acc).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Second and Fourth Claims in the Amended Complaint and on the Counter-Claim Filed by California Coast Credit Union filed by Michael Alan Scott. (Barnes, Robert) QC Mailer sent re: missing hearing date/time (ajs).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ***WITHDRAWN per #84 ***MOTION to Substitute Attorney Sheri M Kanesaka by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall. (Ragland, Karen)Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Amy Hedwig Hall(pty:crc), Attorney Karen A Ragland added to party Russell Merton Hall(pty:crc) QC Mailer sent re: proposed order and wrong event (ajs). Modified on 10/12/2017 (acc).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall and Amy Hedwig Hall (as Trustees), MUFG Union Bank N.A. f/k/a/ Union Bank, N.A. and California Coast Credit Union From the Amended Complaint by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles) QC mail - wrong signature format (lrf).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Counter-Claim Defendant United States of America From the Counter-Claim filed by California Coast Credit Union by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles) QC mail - wrong signature format (lrf).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Second, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims in the Amended Complaint by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles) (lrf).
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting #62 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Robert E. Barnes to A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, and Estate of Frances V. Scott. Attorney Richard A Carpenter terminated as to A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, and Estate of Frances V. Scott. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/28/2017. (lrf)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting in Part #59 Unopposed Joint Motion to Modify Court's May 26, 2017 Scheduling Order. The August 11, 2017 fact discovery deadline is extended to October 6, 2017. No other deadlines in the May 26, 2017 Scheduling Order are modified. Additionally, a Joint Motion to Dismiss the settled claims should be filed on or before September 25, 2017. If a Joint Motion to Dismiss the settled claims and proposed order for dismissal are not submitted on or before September 25, 2017, then a Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on October 10, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Skomal. The conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/28/2017. (lrf)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Conference held on 7/26/2017. Court to issue order. (Plaintiff Attorney Charles M. Duffy)(Defendant Attorney Sheri M Kanesaka, David Michael Parker, Richard A Carpenter, Tony Nasser) (no document attached) (rxa)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Barnes, Robert)Attorney Robert E. Barnes added to party A & F Family Pure Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E. Barnes added to party Estate of Frances V. Scott(pty:crd), Attorney Robert E. Barnes added to party Estate of Neil Alan Scott(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E. Barnes added to party Frances V. Scott(pty:dft) QC mail: proposed order attached (lrf).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing: The Court orders a Telephonic Attorneys Only Status Conference for July 26, 2017 at 1:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate a JOINT call to (619) 557-2993 at 1:15 p.m. on July 26, 2017 with counsel for all parties already on the line. (no document attached) (rxa)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Vacating Hearing on #54 Motion for Summary Judgment. The joint motion to continue the Summary Judgment hearing is granted and the hearing is continued to Tuesday, October 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/19/2017. (lrf)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION Unopposed Joint Motion to Modify the Court's May 26, 2017 Scheduling Order and MOTION to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Russell Merton Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Kanesaka, Sheri). Modified on 7/18/2017 to add MOTION to Continue on 7/18/2017 (lrf).
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony Nasser on behalf of Michael Alan Scott (Nasser, Tony)Attorney Tony Nasser added to party Michael Alan Scott(pty:dft) (lrf).
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE. The Court has been contacted regarding the scheduling of a further settlement conference in this matter. Any party interested in participating in a settlement conference may submit a statement, not exceeding three pages, providing the Court with an update on the party's settlement position by July 7, 2017. Settlement statements should be lodged with the Court by submission to efile_skomal@casd.uscourts.gov. Following review of the statement, the Court will determine if a settlement conference would be appropriate. (no document attached) (rxa)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Answer of Counter-Claimants Russell Merton Hall and Amy Hedwig Hall, Trustees of the Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2011 to Counter-Complaint of California Coast Credit Union ANSWER to #44 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Russell Merton Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kanesaka, Sheri) (lrf).
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONSENT ORDER Granting #53 Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Richard A Carpenter terminated as to Michael Alan Scott. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/12/2017. (lrf)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the First, Second and Fourth Claims in the Amended Complaint and on the Counter-Claim Filed by California Coast Credit Union by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Declaration of Charles Duffy, #4 Duffy Ex A, #5 Duffy Ex B, #6 Duffy Ex C, #7 Duffy Ex D, #8 Duffy Ex E, #9 Duffy Ex F, #10 Duffy Ex G, #11 Duffy Ex H, #12 Duffy Ex I, #13 Duffy Ex J, #14 Duffy Ex K, #15 Duffy Ex L, #16 Duffy Ex M, #17 Duffy Ex N, #18 Duffy Ex O, #19 Duffy Ex P, #20 Duffy Ex Q, #21 Duffy Ex R, #22 Duffy Ex S, #23 Declaration of Jennifer Graham, #24 Graham Ex A, #25 Graham Ex B, #26 Graham Ex C, #27 Graham Ex D, #28 Graham Ex E, #29 Graham Ex F, #30 Graham Ex G, #31 Graham Ex H, #32 Graham Ex I, #33 Graham Ex J, #34 Graham Ex K, #35 Graham Ex L, #36 Graham Ex M, #37 Graham Ex N, #38 Graham Ex O, #39 Graham Ex P, #40 Graham Ex Q, #41 Declaration of Philip Case, #42 Case Ex A, #43 Case Ex B, #44 Declaration of Patricia Moss, #45 Moss Ex A, #46 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Charles) (lrf).
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barnes, Robert)Attorney Robert E. Barnes added to party Michael Alan Scott(pty:dft) QC mail RE: attached proposed order (lrf).
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to #44 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Charles) (lrf).
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ANSWER to #46 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Carpenter, Richard) (lrf).
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to #44 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Carpenter, Richard) (lrf).
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to #45 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Frances V. Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Carpenter, Richard)Attorney Richard A Carpenter added to party Estate of Frances V. Scott(pty:crd), Attorney Richard A Carpenter added to party Estate of Frances V. Scott(pty:crd) (lrf).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 1/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 2/26/2018. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/5/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/26/2017.(lrf)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/22/2017. Case did not settle. Parties are urged to contact the Court after completing discovery on issues discussed at the ENE. Case Management Conference held on 5/22/2017. Court to issue Scheduling Order. (Plaintiff Attorney Charles Duffy). (Defendants' Attorneys: Sheri M Kanesaka, David Parker, Richard Carpenter). (no document attached) (rxa)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint of the United States of America, CROSSCLAIM against Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott, Estate of Frances V. Scott by The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Russell Merton Hall, Amy Hedwig Hall.(Kanesaka, Sheri) QC Mail RE: incorrect state case/caption. Modified on 5/19/2017 to update cross-claim defendants per filing (lrf).
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint of the United States of America, CROSSCLAIM against Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott, Estate of Frances V. Scott by MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A..(Kanesaka, Sheri)Attorney Sheri M Kanesaka added to party MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) QC Mail RE: incorrect state case/caption. Modified on 5/19/2017 to update cross-claim defendants per filing (lrf).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 California Coast Credit Union ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint by United States of America, COUNTERCLAIM by California Coast Credit Union against Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott, United States of America by California Coast Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Counter-Claim)(Parker, David) Modified on 5/18/2017 to update counterclaim defendants per filing (lrf).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION: The Court has carefully considered the parties' confidential ENE briefs and HEREBY CONVERTS the in-person ENE conference to a TELEPHONIC, ATTORNEY'S ONLY conference. Accordingly, Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to coordinate and initiate a JOINT call to the Court at (619) 557-2993 on Monday, May 22, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. PST. (no document attached) (rxa)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTIFICATION OF DEATH Upon the Record by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate, #2 Proof of Service)(Carpenter, Richard) (lrf).
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel by Union Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Byer, Jeffrey) (lrf).
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint by Michael Alan Scott, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, A & F Family Pure Trust, Frances V. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Carpenter, Richard) (lrf).
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America (Duffy, Charles) (lrf).
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott re #36 Joint MOTION to Reschedule ENE and Adjust Corresponding Scheduling Dates (Carpenter, Richard) (lrf).
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #36 Joint Motion to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/2/2017. (lrf)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Reschedule ENE and Adjust Corresponding Scheduling Dates by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott. (Carpenter, Richard) QC EMAIL - missing certificate of service (fth).
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Defendants' Consent to the Filing of An Amended Complaint by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Charles) (fth).
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service) (Duffy, Charles) (fth).
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance - Association of Counsel by David Michael Parker on behalf of California Coast Credit Union (Parker, David)Attorney David Michael Parker added to party California Coast Credit Union (pty:dft) (jpp).
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE AND ORDER resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 5/22/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) will be held at the conclusion of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/28/17.(kas)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying Motions to Dismiss ( #15 , #20 ). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/27/17. (kas)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting ( #28 #29 ) Motions to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sheri Kanesaka is substituted as counsel in place of Attorney Jacky P. Wang, representing Defendants Hall Family Trust, Russell Merton Hall, Amy Hedwig Hall, and MUFG Union Bank, N.A., formerly known as Union Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/11/16. (kas)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Union Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kanesaka, Sheri)Attorney Sheri M Kanesaka added to party Union Bank N.A.(pty:dft) (kas).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kanesaka, Sheri)Attorney Sheri M Kanesaka added to party The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001(pty:dft)(kas).
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry by Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns: Currently on calendar for Monday, June 20, 2016 at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Defendants' motions to dismiss (Docket nos. 15, 20). Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1),the Court finds these motions suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on these matters is taken off calendar and these motions are taken under submission. No appearances will be required in these matters on June 20, 2016. (Court Reporter/ECR N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance). (Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Joinder by California Coast Credit Union re #25 Reply to Response to Motion, to Dismiss Complaint In Its Entirely (Heffner, Holly) (kas).
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Joint Reply to Plaintiff's Joint Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001, Union Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Re Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Wang, Jacky)(kas)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles M. Duffy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Duffy, Charles) (kas).
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/23/16. (kas)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing: Due to the pending motions to dismiss before the District Judge, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference which is currently scheduled for July 20, 2016 before Judge Skomal, is HEREBY VACATED and may be re-set following the Court's ruling on the motions. (no document attached) (mw)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant UnionBanCal Mortgage Corporaton and Disclaimer of Interest by Defendant UnionBanCal Mortgage Corporation by Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byer, Jeffrey) (kas).
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Union Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Jacky) Attorney Jacky P. Wang added to party Union Bank N.A.(pty:dft) (kas).
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Joinder by California Coast Credit Union re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Heffner, Holly) (kas).
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendants Steven Susko and FCI Lender Services, Inc.. These two Defendants have disclaimed their interest in the subject property, and are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as parties. The parties shall each bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/9/16. (kas)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by California Coast Credit Union (Heffner, Holly) (kas).
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant T.D. Service Company. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/05/2016. (jpp)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amy Hedwig Hall, Russell Merton Hall, The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Wang, Jacky)Attorney Jacky P. Wang added to party Amy Hedwig Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Jacky P. Wang added to party Russell Merton Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Jacky P. Wang added to party The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001(pty:dft)(cxl).
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. California Coast Credit Union shall answer by 5/10/2016. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/5/2016. (jah)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE AND ORDER Changing Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation re-set for 7/20/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) will be held at the conclusion of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/2/16.(kas)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by California Coast Credit Union. (Morton, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin Taliaferro Morton added to party California Coast Credit Union (pty:dft) (kas).
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant T.D. Service Company and Disclaimer of Interest by that Defendant by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles)(kas).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ( #8 , #9 ) Joint Motions for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001; Russell Merton Hall; and Amy Hedwig Hall shall answer or otherwise respond by May 6, 2016. Defendants UnionBanCal Mortgage Corporation and MUFG Union Bank, N.A. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/22/16. (kas)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by the Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 and the Trustees to the Trust by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles) (kas).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Union Bank N.A., Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byer, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Mark Byer added to party Union Bank N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Mark Byer added to party Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft) (kas).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Managment Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/3/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) will be held at the conclusion of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/11/16.(kas)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott re #5 Answer to Complaint, (Carpenter, Richard)(dls).
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A & F Family Pure Trust, Estate of Neil Alan Scott, Frances V. Scott, Michael Alan Scott.(Carpenter, Richard) Attorney Richard A Carpenter added to party A & F Family Pure Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Richard A Carpenter added to party Estate of Neil Alan Scott(pty:dft), Attorney Richard A Carpenter added to party Frances V. Scott(pty:dft), Attorney Richard A Carpenter added to party Michael Alan Scott(pty:dft)(kas).
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Disclaimer of Interest by Defendants Steven Susko and FCI Lender Services, Inc. by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles)(kas).
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Martinez on behalf of FCI Lender Services, Inc., Steven Susko (Martinez, Amy)Attorney Amy Elizabeth Martinez added to party FCI Lender Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Elizabeth Martinez added to party Steven Susko(pty:dft)(kas).
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:16-cv-538-LAB-BGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Duffy, Charles)(fth) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hall Family Trust Dated June 8, 2001
Represented By: Jacky P. Wang
Represented By: Karen A Ragland
Represented By: Sheri M. Kanesaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Merton Hall
Represented By: Jacky P. Wang
Represented By: Karen A Ragland
Represented By: Sheri M. Kanesaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Hedwig Hall
Represented By: Jacky P. Wang
Represented By: Karen A Ragland
Represented By: Sheri M. Kanesaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jacky P. Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Byer
Represented By: Sheri M. Kanesaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Coast Credit Union
Represented By: Benjamin Taliaferro Morton
Represented By: David Michael Parker
Represented By: Holly L.K. Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & F Family Pure Trust
Represented By: Alyssa Brooke Kiley
Represented By: Corey Spearman
Represented By: Richard A. Carpenter
Represented By: Robert E. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Alan Scott
Represented By: Alyssa Brooke Kiley
Represented By: Corey Spearman
Represented By: Richard A. Carpenter
Represented By: Robert E. Barnes
Represented By: Tony Nasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Neil Alan Scott
Represented By: Alyssa Brooke Kiley
Represented By: Corey Spearman
Represented By: Richard A. Carpenter
Represented By: Robert E. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances V. Scott
Represented By: Alyssa Brooke Kiley
Represented By: Richard A. Carpenter
Represented By: Robert E. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Susko
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Lender Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Dawn Cobb
Represented By: Alyssa Brooke Kiley
Represented By: Leon J. Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Lawyers Title Company
Represented By: Karen A Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Fidelity National Financial
Represented By: Karen A Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. f/k/a Union Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Karen A Ragland
Represented By: Sheri M. Kanesaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Estate of Frances V. Scott
Represented By: Alyssa Brooke Kiley
Represented By: Corey Spearman
Represented By: Richard A. Carpenter
Represented By: Robert E. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fidelity National Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Karen A Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?