Quinteros v. Paramo
Petitioner: Lionel Quinteros
Respondent: Daniel Paramo
Case Number: 3:2016cv00583
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/18/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/22/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (1) Adopting 16 Report And Recommendation and (2) Denying 1 Petition. It is ordered that the Court adopts in its entirety Judge Burkhardt's Report and Recommendation, (ECF No. 16), and denies with prejudice the Petition (ECF No. 1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/21/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lionel Quinteros. It is ordered that any party to this action may file written objections with the District Court and serve a copy on all parties no later than 5/29/2017. It is further ordered that any reply to the objections shall be filed with the District Court and served on all parties no later than 6/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/8/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinteros v. Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lionel Quinteros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Paramo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?