Rembrandt Diagnostics, LP v. Alere, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Rembrandt Diagnostics, LP |
Defendant: |
Alere, Inc., Alere Toxicology Services, Inc., Amedica Biotech, Inc., Ameditech, Inc., Innovacon, Inc., Instant Technologies, Inc., US Diagnostics, Inc., Branan Medical Corporation and DOES |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00698 |
Filed: |
March 23, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Presiding Judge: |
Nita L. Stormes |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. ยง 0271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 5, 2019 |
Filing
364
ORDER Granting in Part Motion to Retax Costs. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/5/2019. [Doc. No. 360 (anh)
|
August 3, 2018 |
Filing
267
ORDER Vacating Order Dismissing Rembrandt's Claim for Infringement of the '019 Patent. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/3/2018. (acc)
|
February 21, 2018 |
Filing
202
REDACTED ORDER granting 192 Joint Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 199 Joint Motion on Discovery Dispute No. 1. Court denies Assurance's Motion to Compel further responses to Interrogatories 5-10, 12, 16, and 17. Court grants Assurance's Motion to Compel further response to Interrogatory 14. Court denies Assurance's Motion to Compel further response or production to Requests for Emails Nos. 1-6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/21/2018. (jah)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
194
ORDER on Motion for Discovery Dispute (Redacted). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/2/2018.(sjt)
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing
167
Claim Construction Order. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/7/2017. (jjg)
|
October 3, 2017 |
Filing
136
ORDER on 127 , 130 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 1. Court denies Plaintiff Rembrandt Diagnostic, LP's motion to compel further responses and documents from Defendant consistent with the terms set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/3/2017. (jah) (Main Document 136 replaced on 10/3/2017 re redacted version ) (jjg).
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
106
ORDER on Motion to Lift Stay; Order to Show cause [Doc. No. 101 . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/28/2017. (jjg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Rembrandt Diagnostics, LP v. Alere, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Diagnostics, LP |
Represented By: |
Joseph F Jennings |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Alere, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amedica Biotech, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ameditech, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Innovacon, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Instant Technologies, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: US Diagnostics, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Branan Medical Corporation |
Represented By: |
Nora Suzy Dakessian |
Represented By: |
J. Anthony Downs |
Represented By: |
Lana S. Shiferman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: DOES |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?