Doan v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Minh Trieu Doan
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv00841
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Court awards Plaintiff attorney fees in the amount of $23,642.76, as well as costs in the amount of $100.00. Subject to offsets allowed under the Treasury Offset Program, payment is to be made directly to Plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2018. (jah)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Minh Trieu Doan, 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Court overrules Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill's 39 Objection to Report and Re commendation. Court approves and adopting 38 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Court grants Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and denies Defendant's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court remands this case for further proceedings consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/29/2017. (cc: Social Security) (jah)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 22 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2017. A party may respond to any such objection within 14 days of being served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/4/2017.(yeb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doan v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minh Trieu Doan
Represented By: Alexandra T. Manbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?