LF Centennial Limited v. Z-Line Designs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
LF Centennial Limited |
Defendant: |
Z-Line Designs, Inc. and Does 1 through 100 |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00929 |
Filed: |
April 18, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
XX Outside US |
Presiding Judge: |
Jeffrey T. Miller |
Presiding Judge: |
Nita L. Stormes |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 23, 2018 |
Filing
151
ORDER granting 124 Motion to modify Scheduling Order and for leave to file First Amended and Supplemental Complaint; denying 141 Defendant's Motion to Strike. The court vacates the upcoming Pretrial Conference and trial dates.Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/23/2018. (jpp)
|
May 18, 2018 |
Filing
120
ORDER RESETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/30/2018 is vacated and continued to 6/14/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/17/2018.(gac)
|
April 23, 2018 |
Filing
118
ORDER granting 117 Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference to 4/25/2018 at 9:30 am before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is vacated. The parties are directed to notify Chambers once they agree upon an alternate date and the Court will reset the Mandatory Settlement Conference at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/20/2018. (gac)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing
80
ORDER denying Plaintiff LF Centennial Limited's 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. In light of the limited opposition to conducting the contractual audit, Court concludes that the evidentiary record supporting the motion for partial summa ry judgment is inadequate at this point in time to comprehensively resolve the issues presented. To the extent the parties dispute the scope, terms or conditions relevant to the contemplated audit, the parties are instructed to bring such disputes before Magistrate Judge Stormes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/6/2017. (jah). Modified on 6/6/2017 - Order not sealed. Generated NEF (jah).
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
78
REDACTED ORDER Determining Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 3 and Granting LFCL's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/31/2017.(rlu)
|
April 6, 2017 |
Filing
58
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's 46 Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order; (2) Determining Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 1 and Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant's 57 Motion to Compel; (3) Determining Jo int Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 2 and Granting Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Compel. The court Grants LFCL's motion in full, and Orders Z-Line to fully respond to RFP Nos. 1-10 by 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/6/2017. (rlu)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?