Price v. La Mesa, City of et al
Plaintiff: Immanuel C. Price
Defendant: John Doe Officer K9 Handler
Case Number: 3:2016cv01174
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Regarding Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 96 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/6/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery [ECF No. 93 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 12/19/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Discovery; and Sua Sponte Reopening Discovery on a Limited Basis and Extending Pretrial Motions Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 10/9/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RE: Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel [Doc. No. 67 ]; Motion for Extension of Time [To Respond to Discovery Requests] [Doc. No. 68 ]; Motion for Subpoenas [Doc. No. 70 ]; and Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Answer [Doc. No. 65 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/3/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Subpoena forms mailed with order)(anh)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 51 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/4/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Re Second Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/26/2017. (Copy of orders and blank subpoena mailed) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. La Mesa, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immanuel C. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officer K9 Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?