Andren et al v. Alere Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dina Andren and Sidney Bludman
Defendant: Alere Inc., Alere Home Monitoring, Inc. and Alere San Diego, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01255
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Denying 151 Motion for Reconsideration. The hearing set for April 27, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/24/18. (dlg)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 75 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/20/17. (dlg)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Setting Supplemental Briefing Schedule 75 . Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief, no longer than 10 pages, on or before October 13, 2017. Defendant shall file a supplemental responsive brief, no longer than 10 pages, on or before October 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/28/17.(dlg)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER 91 Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored and Hardcopy Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/18/17. (dlg)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 29 Motion to Strike. The hearing set for January 20, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/17/17. (dlg)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend. If Plaintiffs seek to amend the complaint, they shall file an amended complaint within 20 days of the filing date of this order. If Plaintiffs do not seek to file an amended complaint, they shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal within 20 days of the filing date of this order. The hearing date set for September 16, 2016 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/13/16. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andren et al v. Alere Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Andren
Represented By: Peter B. Klausner
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Bludman
Represented By: Peter B. Klausner
Represented By: Mark P. Pifko
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alere Inc.
Represented By: Anthony John Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alere Home Monitoring, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony John Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alere San Diego, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony John Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?