The Koala v. Khosla et al
Plaintiff: The Koala
Defendant: Pradeep Khosla, Daniel Juarez and Justin Pennish
Case Number: 3:2016cv01296
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 73 Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice and Reserve Jurisdiction Over Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/10/2020. (mme)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 54 Motion to Stay proceedings pending determination of the Motion to Recall. However, the court on its own motion Vacates any and all pending dates. Defendants shall have up to and including March 13th, 2020, to file their answer to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/11/2020. (sjt)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/28/2017. (rlu)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; Granting Leave to Amend. The Court grants Plaintiff 14 days leave to amend from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/1/2016. (rlu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Koala v. Khosla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Koala
Represented By: Ryan T Darby
Represented By: John David Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pradeep Khosla
Represented By: William J Carroll
Represented By: Jean-Paul Phillip Cart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Pennish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?