The Estate of Ruben Nunez et al v. County of et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ruben Nunez, Albert Nunez and Lydia Nunez
Defendant: San Diego, County of, Bruce Leicht, Alfred Joshua, Harry Oreol, Kayla Fisher, Marcy Moon, Does 1 - 50 and William Gore
Case Number: 3:2016cv01412
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER Denying Motions to File Under Seal [Docs. No. 353 , 356 , 361 , 367 91 397 ]; and Denying Ex Parte Motion to Intervene [Doc. No. 40 . Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/24/2019. (anh)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER : Granting in Part and Denying in Part Parties' Motions in Limine [Docs. 325 , 326 . 327 ]; Bifurcating Trial; and Denying as Moot Defendant Hansen's Motions in Limine [Doc. 324 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/23/2019. (anh)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider. It is further ordered that the parties re-submit their proposed joint pretrial order and their proposed jury instructions to include Counts 5 and 6 and punitive damages against CPMG within 7 days of this order. As before, the parties proposed jury instructions must comply with the Courts prior order as to format, and the parties are ordered to again meet and confer about the additional jury instructions before submitting them to the Court. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/17/2019.(sjt)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 358 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against Defendant CPMG. The motion is GRANTED only to the extent that Plaintiff may depose Drs. Mannis, Rao and Badre, for no more than four hours each, limited to questioning regarding the contents of the newly produced documents. In all other respects, the motion for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/4/19. (Dembin, Mitchell)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 268 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 273 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 274 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 275 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 280 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 291 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/3/2018. (anh)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 229 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order and for Sanctions. As provided herein, Defendant County is ORDERED to produce excerpts of any CPMG Quarterly Reports or any CPMG Psychiatr ic Peer/Record Reviews in its possession to the extent that they refer to the treatment and death of Ruben Nunez and/or refer to Drs. Naranjo and/or Hansen within 14 days of this Order. The Court declines to issue an order to show cause why Defendant County should be sanctioned at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/13/17. (Dembin, Mitchell)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute regarding Requests for Production served upon Defendant Correctional Physicians Medical Group, Inc. CPMG is ORDERED to produce excerpts of the Quarterly Report of July September 2015 which discuss, pertain or relate to the care, treatment and death of Ruben Nunez to Plaintiff within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/21/17. (Dembin, Mitchell)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER on Joint Discovery Motion Presenting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents (ECF No. 150 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/11/2017. (knb)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: (1) Granting Plaintiffs' 78 Motion for Reconsideration; (2) Granting Plaintiffs' Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint; and (3) Denying Defendants' 41 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/10/2017.(knb)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying without prejudice 96 Joint MOTION for Discovery Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Number of Depositions. for the reasons expressed in the Order, Plaintiffs must exhaust their allotted 10 depositions before seeking leave of Court for additional depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 05/16/17. (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 58 Ex Parte Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/28/2017. (knb)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting defendant's 29 Motion for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint. Defendant is granted leave to file a third-party complaint against CPMG, Jorge Naranjo, and Sara Hansen, lodged as Exhibit A to the Motion, within three days of the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/7/16. (kas)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 3 Ex Parte Motion for Order Appointing Plaintiff. Lydia Nunez as Successor in Interest to the Estate of Ruben Nunez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/14/2016. (knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Ruben Nunez et al v. County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ruben Nunez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Represented By: Julia Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Nunez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Represented By: Julia Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Nunez
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Represented By: Julia Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Represented By: Carra Lassman Rhamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Leicht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Joshua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Oreol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?