Francis v. Oregon State University et al
Plaintiff: Sydney Francis
Defendant: Oregon State University, Taras Liskevych and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2016cv01860
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The docket reflects that Plaintiff has not filed any motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/18/2018.(ajs)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Oregon State University is Granted.(ECF No. 29 ). The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Oregon State University. Plaintiff shall file any motion for leave to file an amended com plaint pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1 and within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is issued. This Order constitutes notice to Plaintiff that the Court will dismiss this action against Defendant Liskevych without prejudice on 12/20/2017 un less, no later than that date, Plaintiff files either (1) proof that service of the summons and complaint was timely effectuated or (2) a declaration under penalty of perjury showing good cause for failure to timely effect service upon the Defendant Liskevych accompanied by a motion for leave to serve process outside of the 90-day period. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/29/2017. (ajs)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 24 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. No later than fourteen (14) days from the date this order is issued, Plaintiff may file the proposed first amended complaint which is attached to the motion. If Plaintiff does not file the first amended complaint within fourteen days, the Court will order the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 09/11/2017. (ajs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Oregon State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Francis
Represented By: Thomas Merrett Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taras Liskevych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?