Dew v. Hatton et al
Petitioner: David L. Dew
Respondent: Shawn Hatton and Scott Kernan
Case Number: 3:2016cv01985
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Jurisdiction. In light of the Ninth Circuit's order, the Court dismisses the second or successive petition for writ of habeas corpus for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b) without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/4/2019.(rmc)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Jurisdiction. In light of the Ninth Circuit's order, the Court dismisses the second or successive petition for writ of habeas corpus for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b) without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/4/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; Granting Respondents' 7 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Dismissing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and Declining to Issue Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/21/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dew v. Hatton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David L. Dew
Represented By: Daniel Olmos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Hatton
Represented By: Matthew C Mulford(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Kernan
Represented By: Matthew C Mulford(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?