Diaz v. California Correctional Health Care Services et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Carlos Diaz, SR.
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services, Sidighi, Newton, Doe #1 Laxamanna, Cheryl Schutt, Dr. Newton and Mr. Laxamanna
Case Number: 3:2016cv02244
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting 63 Report and Recommendation (2) Granting 52 Motion to Dismiss. This Court, having reviewed de novo the Magistrate Judge's R&R, adopts the R&R in its entirety. Defendant Sedighi's motion to dismiss is granted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/28/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 12, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting Report and Recommendation, (2) Denying Motion to Dismiss, (3) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Motion to Amend and (4) Denying Motion for Summary Judgment. This Court, having reviewed de novo the Magistrate Judge's R&R, ad opts the R&R in its entirety. Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend is granted as to Defendant Newton and denied as to Defendant Laxamanna. Defendant Sidighi's motion to dismiss is denied, and Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is also denied. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/12/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 10, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. (ECF Nos. 21 , 25 , 29 , 31 , 33 , 43 ) The Court RECOMMENDS (1) Dr. Sidighi's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 25) be DENIED, (2) Plaintiff� 39;s Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (ECF No. 21) be GRANTED as to Dr. Newton and DENIED as to Officer Laxamanna, and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 41 at 33-36) be DENIED. Any party to this action may file writte n objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties no later than August 30, 2017. Any Reply to the Objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than September 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/10/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 5, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) granting 36 Request for Extension of time re 21 MOTION to Amend ( Reply due by 6/19/2017); (2) denying 38 Request for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/5/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) Modified text on 6/5/2017 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. California Correctional Health Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Carlos Diaz, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #1 Laxamanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Schutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Laxamanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?