Padilla v. Kernan et al
Plaintiff: |
Mauro Padilla |
Defendant: |
Scott Kernan, Raymond Madden, Armando Favila, Shlomo Posner, J. Denault, A.M. Rodriguez, Ken Phillips, M. Voong and S.K. Hemenway |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv02339 |
Filed: |
September 14, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Imperial |
Presiding Judge: |
Roger T. Benitez |
Presiding Judge: |
Peter C. Lewis |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 13, 2018 |
Filing
47
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Because Plaintiff has not shown his claims are likely to succeed, nor has Plaintiff shown he is incapable of adequately representing himself on complex claims, Court cannot find reason to appoint counsel to assist Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 2/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Filing
42
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by M. Voong, Armando Favila, S.K. Hemenway, J. Denault, Raymond Madden, A.M. Rodriguez, Ken Phillips, Scott Kernan, Shlomo Posner Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2018 Replies due by 2/5/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 1/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER: (1) Granting 21 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Summons. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
|
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Compel Prison Officials to Provide Trust Account Statements, and for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Plaintiff is granted forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order in whic h to re-open his case by either: (1) paying the entire $400 statutory and administrative filing fee, or (2) filing a new Motion to Proceed IFP. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/14/2017.(Sent IFP form to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
|
October 25, 2016 |
Filing
3
ORDER: (1) Denying 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; and (2) Dismissing Civil Action without Prejudice for Failing to Pay Filing Fees or move to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff forty-five (45) days leave from the date this Order is filed to re-open this case by: (a) prepaying the entire $400 civil filing and administrative fee in full; or (b) completing and filing a Motion to Proceed IFP. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/24/2016.(Sent IFP form to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?