Arellano v. Blahnik
Plaintiff: Raul Arellano
Defendant: Blahnik
Case Number: 3:2016cv02412
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Denying Motion for Transcripts, Reconsideration and Copies [Doc. No. 216 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/19/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel [Doc. No. 190 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/8/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Denying Motion to File Motion for Reconsideration [Doc. No. 182 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/15/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment RE: Punitive Damages [Doc. No. 169 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/30/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Regarding Motion to be Sent Copies of Certain Documents [Doc. No. 167 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/28/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER : (1) Adopting Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 160 ]; Rejecting Defendant's Objections [Doc. No. 161 ]; (3) Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 134 ; and (4) Setting Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/28/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration [Doc. No. 128 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/7/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Denying Rule 60(b) Motion [Doc. No. 119 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/27/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Denying Motion "To Know if Permitted to Include as Relief Freedom from Incarceration" [Doc. No. 114 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/5/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 110 ; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part (Without Prejudice) Motion for Discovery Sanctions [Doc. No. 97 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/30/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge Regarding Defendant's Motion for Discovery Sanctions [ECF No. 97 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 6/28/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference at RJ Donovan Correctional Facility on October 28, 2019. The Court hereby VACATES the MSC set for April 8, 2019, and ORDERS the parties to attend an MSC on October 28, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 4/4/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & sent to RJD vial U.S. Mail)(dlg)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying Objection to Magistrate Judge Order [Doc. No. 91 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/19/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Motion to Appoint Counsel; and Motion to Allow Appeal (ECF No. 85 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block on 9/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: (1) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel and For Permission to Appeal [ECF No. 74 ]; (2) Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time [ECF No. 76 ]; Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Copies [ECF No. 78 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block on 8/15/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration for Appointment of Counsel, Request for Certification of an Interlocutory Appeal, and Extension of Time While the Instant Motion is Pending. [ECF No. 65 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block on 7/3/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel and Extension of Time [ECF No. 58 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block on 5/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: (1) Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion Requesting to Know Date of Deposition 49 ; and (2) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 51 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block on 3/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: (1) Adopting Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 13 ; (2) Granting In Part Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 6 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/17/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying in Part and Granting in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 6 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 6/29/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano v. Blahnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blahnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?