Osgood et al v. Main Streat Marketing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Claudine Osgood and Anton Ewing
Defendant: Main Streat Marketing, LLC, Jerrod Robker, DOES 1-100, ABC Corporations 1-100 and XYZ, LLC's 1-100
Case Number: 3:2016cv02415
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting Dismissal of Action by Plaintiff Claudine Osgood. The Court vacates the hearing on June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/4/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting Plaintiff Ewing's Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer and Granting Plaintiffs Ewing and Osgood's Motion for Entry of Default 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Dkt. No. 64 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Plaintiff Ewing's 55 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Denying Plaintiff Ewing's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. The hearing date set for June 9, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/31/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting Defense Counsel's 44 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Defendant Jerrod McAllister, an individual, may proceed pro se, Defendant Main Streat Marketing, LLC, a partnership, may not proceed without counsel. The Court will allow M ain Streat Marketing, LLC 30 days to obtain substitute counsel and have counsel file a notice of appearance. Mr. McAllister must notify the Court of his currently mailing address within 30 days from the date of this order. The hearing set for April 7, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/27/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re: 15 Motion to Strike ; 16 Motion to Dismiss. It is ordered that the Court grants in part and denies in part defendants' motion to dismiss and grants in part and denies in part,otion to strike. The Court also denies defendants� 39; motion for sanctions. Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days of this order curing deficiencies noted by the Court. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Remand to State Court. The hearing set for November 18, 2016 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osgood et al v. Main Streat Marketing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudine Osgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Streat Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Safia G. Hussain
Represented By: Yosef Adam Mahmood
Represented By: Ana Tagvoryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrod Robker
Represented By: Safia G. Hussain
Represented By: Yosef Adam Mahmood
Represented By: Ana Tagvoryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ, LLC's 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?