Smith v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Margarette Smith
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02519
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 85 Ex Parte Motion to Stay the Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/26/18. (dlg)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying 63 Motion to Withdraw as Named Plaintiffs and Substitute Nick Nikki as Named Plaintiff. The hearing date set for April 27, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/20/18. (dlg)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying Defendant's 58 Motion for Protective Order; and Granting Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/6/18. (dlg)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 09/21/2017. (ajs)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 25 Motion for Substitution of Parties. Movants shall file a Second Amended Complaint that substitutes them in place of Plaintiff Smith in this action within (7) days of this order. The hearing date set for September 15, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/13/17. (dlg)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Deferring Ruling on motion to Dismiss 19 . The Court defers ruling on Defendant's motion to dismiss until the Courts ruling on the motion to substitute parties that Plaintiff intends to file by July 25, 2017. The hearing date set for July 21, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/12/17.(dlg)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within seven days of the filed date of the order. The hearing date set for May 5, 2017 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/17. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarette Smith
Represented By: Lorenzo Belmondo Cellini
Represented By: Kristen Law Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?