Williams v. Resler et al
Plaintiff: Steven Gregory Williams
Defendant: S. Resler, C. Hernandez, E. Garza, D. Servantes, R. Din, J. Juarez, G. Stratton and H. Liu
Case Number: 3:2016cv02538
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: (1) Adopting Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 69 ); and (2) Granting In Part and Denying in Part Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 60 ) Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/24/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 60 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/24/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 53 ] and Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 23 ]. Plaintiff has until May 4, 2018 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 23 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/15/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of First Amended Complaint Upon Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) and 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). (IFP Packet Prepared). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy of Order Doc. No. 3 Mailed)(Certified Copy to USM) (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Resler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gregory Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Resler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Servantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Din
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?