Guzman v. Spearman
Petitioner: Irwin Guzman
Respondent: Spearman
Case Number: 3:2016cv02659
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Andrew G. Schopler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court dismisses the Petition with prejudice. Further, the Court denies Petitioner's request for an evidentiary hearing, and declines to issue a certificate of appealability.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Adopting 36 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and Granting 31 Petitioner's Motion to Amend Petition. The assigned magistrate judge is directed to issue a briefing schedule modifying the original briefing schedule issued in this case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Re: 22 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/14/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(amk)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying 21 Motion for Appointed Counsel; ORDER to Show Cause; and Report and Recommendation on Ground Six. The Court denies the request for appointed counsel at this time. The Court orders Guzman to file a memorandum, by August 4, 2017, ex plaining why Ground Five should not be dismissed for failing to exhaust his state court remedies. The Court recommends dismissing Ground Six, but granting Guzman leave to amend his petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lrf) (Main Document 22 replaced on 7/13/2017) (yeb).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Irwin Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Spearman
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?