Thibodeau v. ADT Security Services
Plaintiff: Clayton Del Thibodeau
Defendant: ADT Security Services
Case Number: 3:2016cv02680
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Andrew G. Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER on Cross Motions for Re-Taxation of Costs (ECF Nos. 143 , 146 ). Plaintiff is thus entitled to $20,099.17. The Court once again enters final judgment against Defendant as to Plaintiff's first, fourth, and eighth claims. All claims in this matter are thus hereby resolved. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/21/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Memorandum Decision following trial and ORDER for entry of Judgment. The Court finds that Plaintiff prevailed on his UCL and section 2802 mileage reimbursement claims. Judgment is entered with respect thereto in the amount of $11,254.93. Plainti ff also prevailed on his section 1198.5 claim under the Labor Code, to which judgment is entered in the amount of $750. Because Plaintiff did not establish a section 226 violation, judgement is entered against Plaintiff on his section 226 claim. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 112 Motion. The Court will: (1) DENY the motion to vacate settlement conference as moot; (2) SET a limited portion of Plaintiff's request for recusal for hearing on October 26, 2018, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D . Any responses must be submitted before October 12, 2018. Any reply must be submitted before October 19, 2018. (3) GRANT the motion to reconsider procedures for court service of documents on plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to add Mr. Clayton Del Thibodeau to the service list and to send all future orders, notices, judgments, and docket entries to the email address listed in this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/1/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 106 Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference and Amend the Scheduling Order; Directing Plaintiff to Consider Service by CM/ECF; and Denying Motion for Reconsideration. A Settlement Conference is rescheduled for September 12, 2 018 at 9:00 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Lewis. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the assigned district judge by October 19, 2018. The final Pretrial Conference is scheduled on the calendar of the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel on October 26, 2018 at 1:30pm. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/24/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 102 Request for the Recusal of Judge Curiel and Magistrate Judge Schopler. The Court denies Plaintiff's Request to Cancel or Reschedule the Settlement Conference. The settlement conference set for July 20, 2018 shall go forward pursuant to Magistrate Judge Averitte's Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying 86 Motion for Disqualification and Removal of Defendant ADT LLC's Attorney of Record and Denying Defendant's Request for Sanctions. The Court vacates the hearing currently set for June 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/4/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Denying 80 Motion for Reconsideration of and/or Amendment to Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment. The Court vacates the hearing currently set for April 20, 2018. The parties are directed to submit a joint request to the Honorable Mag istrate Judge Schopler for a renewed scheduling order to set pre- trial deadlines and a pretrial conference date within seven business days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/16/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying 74 Plaintiff's Demand for final, Appealable Language of Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/12/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Amended 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. What remains in this case are Plaintiff's First, Fourth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/31/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 1/8/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrg)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Opposition Brief (re 49 ); and Restating Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall file any Second Amended Opposition no later than Friday, December 1, 2017. Defendant shall file any reply no later than Friday, December 15, 2017. Further, the Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of Dkt. No. 57. A hearing for this matter is scheduled for January 19, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/13/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & ECF 57)(dlg)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Opposition Brief ( 49 ); Resetting Briefing Schedule; and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Quash. The Court hereby strikes Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summa ry Judgment (Dkt. No. 55). Plaintiff shall file any amended opposition brief no later than Friday, December 1, 2017. Defendant shall file any reply to an amended opposition no later than Friday, December 15, 2017. The Court continues the hearing set for December 8, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. That hearing is now scheduled for January 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. The Court denies as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Defendant's Service of Summons (Dkt. No. 47 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/6/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/28/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Directing Plaintiff to File Complete Amended Complaint by December 12, 2016 (ECF 12 ); Denying as Moot 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and Vacating Hearing Date Set for January 13, 2017. If Plaintiff wishes to continue pursuing h is first ten causes of action, originally filed in state court, he must file a complete Amended Complaint with all nineteen causes of action no later than December 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/29/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thibodeau v. ADT Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Del Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT Security Services
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rothrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?