January 29, 2019 |
Filing
165
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 142 ) is Adopted in its entirety. It is further Ordered that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 101 ) is Granted. Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 116 ) is Denied. This case is dismissed. The Clerk is ordered to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff and to close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
142
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order: (1) Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF Nos. 101 , 116 ]. No later than 09/14/2018, any party to this action may file written objections. Any reply to the objections must be filed and served on all parties no later than 09/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 08/22/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
120
ORDER Denying 118 Plaintiff's Request to Take Judicial Notice of Proceedings in Another Case Regarding County Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 06/01/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
89
ORDER Denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion to Order San Diego Central Jail for Access to the Courts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 01/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing
81
AMENDED ORDER Denying 73 Plaintiff's Request for Return of Legal Property as Moot; Denying 75 Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions and Injunctive Relief; and Denying 79 Plaintiff's Request for Emergency Extraordinary Writ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 01/18/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
80
ORDER Denying 74 Plaintiff's Request for Return of Legal Property as Moot; Denying Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Sanctions and Injunctive Relief; and Denying 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Extraordinary Writ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/11/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
|
November 16, 2017 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request to Take Judicial Notice of Appellate Opinion (ECF No. 62 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/16/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
September 12, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt # 43 ) is adopted in its entirety. The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dkt # 28 ) is granted: the motion to dismiss all claims against Defendant Dumanis is granted with prej udice; the motion to dismiss the claims in Count Five against Defendant Castro and Defendant Jones is granted with prejudice; the motion to dismiss the state law claims in Count Two and Count Three, and to dismiss Count Four, is granted with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/12/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) Modified on 9/13/2017 to correct docket file-date. NEF was regenerated. (mdc)
|
June 29, 2017 |
Filing
43
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION For Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Dkt # 28 ): Objections to R&R due by 7/28/2017. Replies due by 8/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/29/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
|
January 31, 2017 |
Filing
12
ORDER (1) Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Dkt # 2 ), (2) Denying Motion For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction (Dkt # 11 ), And (3) Directing U.S. Marshal To Effect Service: The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is directed to collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 filing fee owed in this case by garnishing monthly payments from his account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income and forwarding those payment s to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 pursuant to 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/31/2017. (IFP package prepared. Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR. Per Order, a copy also was mailed to Secretary of CDCR at address in Order.) (mdc)
|