Ardds v. Hudge et al
Plaintiff: Antoine L. Ardds
Defendant: D. Hudge and L. Romero
Case Number: 3:2016cv02904
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: The Motion for Appointment of Counsel is Denied without prejudice. (ECF No. 56 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Plaintiff's motions (ECF Nos. 30 , 33 , 43 , 47 , 50 , 52 , 58 , 63 , 68 and 70 ) for injunctive relief are Denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/22/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (1) Denying Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Complaint As Moot; (2) Directing U.S. Marshal To Effect Service Of FAC; And (3) Denying Motion To Notify Director's Office (Dkt #s 20 , 21 , 23 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/4/2017. (IFP package prepared on the First Amended Complaint.) (mdc)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: (1) Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (3) Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Improperly Named Defendant; and (4) Dismissing Civil Action For Failure to State A Cla im. This civil action is dismissed failing to state a claim upon which § 1983 relief can granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1915A(b)(1). Plaintiff's Motion to File a Supplemental Complaint is granted and Plai ntiff has forty-five (45) days leave from the date of this Order in which to re-open his case by filing an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading described in this Order. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to coll ect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/28/2017. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR).(Defendant "D. Hudge" to corrected to "D. Hodge" in the Court's docket)((blank forms mailed to Plaintiff t/w this order)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ardds v. Hudge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine L. Ardds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?