Greenbroz, Inc. v. Laeger Built, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Greenbroz, Inc.
Defendant: Laeger Built, LLC, Jeffery Laeger and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2016cv02946
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The parties' Joint Motion for Entry of an Agreed Judgment is Hereby Granted. The case has been settled in accordance with the terms of the Agreed Judgment. Further, as set forth in the settlement all claims and counterclaims not disposed of in the Agreed Judgment are dismissed with prejudice. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court shall Close the case. It is So Ordered. (jjg)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense [Doc. No. 19 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/22/2017. (jjg)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 11] is Denied with respect to personal jurisdiction; Jeffery Laegers Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim [Doc. No. 11] is Granted; Defendants Motion to For a More Definite Statement [Doc. No. 11] is Denied as moot; and, Plaintiffs request for Jurisdictional Discovery [Doc. No. 13] is Denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenbroz, Inc. v. Laeger Built, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenbroz, Inc.
Represented By: John K. Buche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laeger Built, LLC
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Laeger
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?