Rodriguez v. Montgomery
Petitioner: Francisco Rodriguez
Respondent: W.L. Montgomery
Case Number: 3:2016cv02948
Filed: December 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is in favor of W.L. Montgomery against Francisco Rodriguez(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Francisco Rodriguez. Objections to R&R due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 11/9/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Dismissing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Any party of this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties no later than 10/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 10/2/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W.L. Montgomery
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?