Chen v. Illumina, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Yi Fan Chen and Frontline Global Trading Pte. Ltd.
Defendant: Illumina, Inc., Francis A. Desouza and Marc A. Stapley
Case Number: 3:2016cv03044
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Conditionally Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [ECF No. 95 ]. Final Approval Hearing set for 4/20/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5B before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/18/2019. (lrf)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting in Part and Denies in Part Joint Motion for Leave to File a Surreply [ECF No. 87 ]. Defendants' surreply, currently lodged as ECF No. 87-1, is considered filed. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/24/2019. (lrf)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to File Second Amended Complaint [ECF No. 62 ]. The Court denies Ms. McCormick's motion without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling it with a showing of good cause and diligence. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/4/2019. (lrf)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Denying Joint Motions for Determination of Discovery Dispute Doc. Nos. 76 & 77 ]. The parties have not made a sufficient effort to work through their disagreements and to resolve all disputes without the necessity of court intervention, as required. Both discovery motions are, therefore, denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/30/2018. (lrf)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying 69 Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal. Defendants' motion to file under seal is denied without prejudice. As such, these documents need not be filed on the public docket and will be returned to the parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/2/2018. (rmc)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/22/2018. (jao)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 5 Motion of Natissisa Enterprises Ltd. for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and ; granting 5 Motion to Consolidate with Member Case 17-cv-00053-L-MDD. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/30/2017. (sjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Illumina, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Fan Chen
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontline Global Trading Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illumina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis A. Desouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A. Stapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?