Stevenson v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Stevie J. Stevenson
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard, PHD, Scott Kernan, Shannon Swain, Raymond Madden, Dennis Brown, N. Telles, C. Bell, Unknown Initials C or PC, C. Walker, John & Jane Does and J. Rohrer
Case Number: 3:2016cv03079
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 127 Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Modify Briefing Schedule on 125 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants must file any opposition to Plaintiffs Motion on or before December 2, 23 202 0. Plaintiff may file any reply brief on or before December 23, 2020. Upon completion of the briefing, the Court will take the matter under submission without an oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.l(d)(l) and no personal appearances will be required. Counsel is ADMONISHED to comply with the undersigned's Civil Case Procedures and Chambers' Rules with respect to any future motion and/or ex parte application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 11/3/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: (1) Denying 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and (2) Granting Plaintiff leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted forty-five (45) days from the date on which this Order is electronically docketed to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/16/2020. (jpp)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER (1) Adopting 47 Report and Recommendation; and (2) Granting in part and Denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss. It is ordered, Claim 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court finds that no amendment can cure the claim preclusion bar of this claim, and Plaintiff is not granted leave to amend this claim. In contrast, all claims against Defendant Kernan are dismissed without prejudice. The remainder of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/11/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Approval of Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 6/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Re 58 Motion for Clarification and Requests for Documents. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/4/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Copy of Docket/R&R Mailed)(mpl).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of U.S. Magistrate Judge: re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Objections to the R&R are due by 5/14/2018. Replies are due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 4/26/2018.(mpl)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Renewed 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion to File Future Amended Complaint. The Court requests Plaintiff gather the information he requires for any subsequent amendments or supplements, and petition the Court for leave to amend his complaint at that time. Plaintiff's motion to file a future amended complaint or a future supplemental complaint is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 11/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER 1) Granting 7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and; 2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of First Amended Complaint Upon Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (IFP Packet Mailed) (mpl)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis And 3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; (2) Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim; And (3) Denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction And/or Protective Order. The Se cretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month incom e credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR.) The Court grants plaintiff f orty-five (45) days leave from the date of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint which cures all the noted pleading deficiencies. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint must be complete by itself without reference to his original pleading. Defendants not named and any claim not re-alleged in his Amended Complaint will be considered waived. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint within the time provided, the Court will enter a final Order dismissing this civil action base d both on Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b), and his failure to prosecute in compliance with a court order requiring amendment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/16/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie J. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard, PHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Initials C or PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?