Cones v. Parexel International Corporation
Plaintiff: Schoulee Cones
Defendant: Parexel International Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv03084
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 83 Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Class and Collective Action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2018. (lrf)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER on Motions to File Documents Under Seal (ECF Nos. 48 , 59 ). Based on the foregoing, the Motion to file the deposition transcript under seal, (ECF 48 ), is denied. If Plaintiffs believe they can show good cause to file it under seal, they ma y file a renewed motion to file it under seal by 6/29/2018. If a motion is not filed by 6/29/2018, the Court will order it filed in the public docket. The Motion to file the employment agreements under seal, (ECF 59 ), is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/21/2018. (mxn)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Quash; denying 79 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/20/2018. (sjt)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 91 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/16/2018. (mxn)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Denying 86 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/10/2018. (mxn)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs prayer for punitive damages is dismissed. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/6/2017. (sjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cones v. Parexel International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schoulee Cones
Represented By: Patrick N. Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parexel International Corporation
Represented By: Michael Warner Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?