Carbonell v. San Diego, County of et al
Plaintiff: Sonia Ines Carbonell
Defendant: San Diego, County of, TERM, OptumHealth, Sara Maltzman, Rada West, Le Ann Skimming and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2017cv00064
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Plaintiff has had three opportunities to state claims for violation of 42 U.S.C. § 1981, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and Title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, without success. Accordingly, the motions are Granted and the SAC Is Dismissed With Prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall Close this case. It Is So Ordered.(jjg)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Motions to Dismiss [Doc. Nos. 16 - 19 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/07/2017. (jjg)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Because the First Case, 17cv363-BAS(BLM) serves no purpose, Court will exercise its inherent power to control its docket and close that case. Court dismisses the First Case, Case No. 17cv363-BAS(BLM). The Clerk is directed to close the First Case. The parties are to proceed in this case. This dismissal will not constitute an adjudication on the merits. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/18/2017. (Original Order filed in 17cv363-BAS(BLM)) (jah)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 10 First Amended Complaint. Defendants OptumHealth, Le Ann Skimming, TERM, and Rada West shall answer by 6/14/2017. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/9/2017. (jah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbonell v. San Diego, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Ines Carbonell
Represented By: William J Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERM
Represented By: Craig Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumHealth
Represented By: Craig Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Maltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rada West
Represented By: Craig Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Ann Skimming
Represented By: Craig Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?