Apple Inc. v. Qualcomm Incorporated

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2017cv00108
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Seal (ECF Nos. 1101 1113 1073 1076 1116 1090 1110 1087 1085 1099 1095 1102 1118 1091 1083 1105 1093 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/19. (dlg)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part ( 1120 , 1121 ) Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/19. (dlg)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER Granting Motions to File Under Seal ( 887 890 894 897 900 903 906 909 912 915 916 920 924 925 930 934 935 940 944 947 950 951 956 957 962 964 968 969 972 976 991 995 1000 1004 1007 1011 1016 1021 1033 1049 1052 1056 1059 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/19. (dlg)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER Granting 787 790 794 795 798 800 806 809 810 811 817 819 821 827 830 833 835 843 846 853 855 858 863 866 871 872 880 Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/19. (dlg)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER Granting in Part 647 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/27/18. (dlg)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER Denying as Moot Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Certain Patents are Unenforceable Due to Exhaustion (Count LIX of Apple's Amended Complaint and Count LXVII of the CMS' Counterclaims); and Apple's Ex Parte Application to Supplement Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( 600 , 661 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/17/18. (dlg)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER Granting 616 Qualcomm's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Apple's First AmendedComplaint and the CMs' Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/20/18. (dlg)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Apple's 599 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Second Amended Counterclaim for Tortious Interference with Contract as Time-Barred. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/8/18. (dlg)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER on Joint 455 , 546 Motion for Discovery Dispute Re: Apple's Clawback of 34 Documents. The Court ORDERS the forty clawed back documents produced. The Court further ORDERS that the parties file public copies of both joint motions within one week of this order, redacting only information subject to privilege and work product protections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/18. (dlg)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Joint 553 Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Presenting Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/4/18. (dlg)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER Granting in Part (ECF Nos. 554 , 561 ) Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Apple is ordered to file a redacted version of ECF No. 555-4 that eliminates individual's addresses and phone numbers within five days of the date of this Order. The Clerk shall delay unsealing for seven days to allow the parties to file additional support for their motions to seal these particular documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/21/18. (dlg)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER Affirming 547 Magistrate Judge Dembin's Order Denying Apple's Motion to Compel. The Court VACATES the hearing currently set for September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/14/18. (dlg)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER Granting ( 548 , 566 ) Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/13/18. (dlg)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER Construing Disputed Claim Terms of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,096,021; 7,289,630; 6,556,549; 9,137,822; 6,694,469; 7,095,725 (ECF Nos. 299 , 300 ); and Denying 331 Qualcomm's Motion to Strike Apple's First and Second Amended Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/16/18. (dlg)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER: (1) Granting Qualcomm's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims [Dkt. No. 422 ] (2) Granting Qualcomm's Motion to Seal [Dkt. No. 416 ]. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/26/2018. (jjg)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER Granting 405 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/10/2018. (mxn)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling: (1) Construing Disputed Claim Terms of US Patent Nos. 7,096,021; 6,556,549; 9,137,822; 6,694,469; 7,289,630; 7,095,725 ( 299 , 300 ); (2) Denying Qualcomm's Motion to Strike Apple's First and Second Amended Invalidity Contentions ( 331 ). Counsel are advised that the Court's rulings are tentative, and the Court will entertain additional argument at the hearing on March 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/21/18.(dlg)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER on 353 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Qualcomm's Responses to Apple's Third Set of Special Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 38. As provided herein, Apples motion to compel further responses to Interrogatori es 21 and 38, as presented in this Joint Motion, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Within 14 days of this Order, Qualcomm is ORDERED to: 1. Respond fully to Interrogatory 21 limited to its licensees Compal Electronics, Inc., Pegatron Corporati on, FIH Mobile Ltd (Foxconn), Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., and Wistron Corporation; and, 2. In further response to Interrogatory 38, provide the identities of its personnel knowledgeable of each assertion that a standard is satisfied by a portion of a patent-in-dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/14/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER on 347 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Apple's Supplemental Responses to Qualcomm's First and Second Sets of Interrogatories. Qualcomms motion to compel, as presented in this Joint Motion, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Apple is ORDERED to further respond to Interrogatories 24 and 27, as provided herein, within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/13/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER on 325 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute re Custodial and Non-Custodial Searches. As provided herein, Qualcomm's motion to compel the CMs to search additional custodians and to run certain search terms, as presented in this Joint Motion, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 2/23/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Granting Joint 291 Stipulation and Discovery Coordination Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/18. (dlg)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Granting Motions to Seal [Dkt. Nos. 101 , 120 , 128 , 147 ]. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/8/2017. (lrf)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Requiring Meet and Confer; Denying Plaintiff Apple, Inc.'s Ex Parte 150 Motion for Leave to Amend as Moot. The Parties are to withdraw the currently pending Joint Motions (ECF Nos. 149, 152, and 156) and file a coherent joint motion representing only those RFPs that remain truly in dispute after a meaningful meet and confer by November 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/25/17. (dlg)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Denying 92 Motion for Anti-Suit Injunction. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/7/17. (dlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Qualcomm Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Juanita R Brooks
Represented By: Betty Hong Chen
Represented By: Ruffin B. Cordell
Represented By: Meredith R. Dearborn
Represented By: Lauren A. Degnan
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Leah Adine Edelman
Represented By: Benjamin C. Elacqua
Represented By: Steven C Holtzman
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Aamir A Kazi
Represented By: Amy J Mauser
Represented By: Christopher George Renner
Represented By: Gabriel R. Schlabach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?