Shah v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Rasesh Shah
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated, Steve Mollenkopf, Paul E. Jacobs, George S. Davis and William Keitel
Case Number: 3:2017cv00121
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Denying 167 Motion to Reconsider 165 . Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/24/2020. (mme)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Granting 141 Non-Parties Apple Inc.; Compal Electronics Inc.; FIH Mobile LTD.; Hon Hai Precision Industry Co.; LTD.; Pegatron Corporation; and Wistron Corporation's Assented-To Motion to Supplement the Protective Order. This Supplementa l Protective Order incorporates by reference all provisions of the Protective Order entered by this Court on May 29, 2019 (Docket Nos. 78-1 & 79) to the extent not expressly referenced herein, except where there is a conflict between the terms of this Supplemental Protective Order and the May 29, 2019 Protective Order, in which case this Supplemental Protective Order shall govern. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 1/9/2020. (mme)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 132 Non-Party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.'s Assented-To Motion to Supplement the Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 11/7/2019. (mme)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 40 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/18/2019. (jpp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasesh Shah
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Stefan H Atkinson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Karen P. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Mollenkopf
Represented By: Stefan H Atkinson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Karen P. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Jacobs
Represented By: Stefan H Atkinson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Karen P. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Davis
Represented By: Stefan H Atkinson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Karen P. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Keitel
Represented By: Stefan H Atkinson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Karen P. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?