Linlor v. The National Rifle Association of America
Plaintiff: James Linlor
Defendant: The National Rifle Association of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv00203
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying 28 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. The Court DENIES Defendant's motion for reconsideration. Because the Court denies Defendant's motion for reconsideration, the Court declines to address Defendant's second request for attorneys' fees (Doc. No. 29). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/9/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 20 Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to California Civil Code § 3344. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/25/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Remand; Granting Defendant's 3 Motion to Dismiss and Denying Defendant's 11 Motion for Sanctions. The Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss and dismisses Plaintiff's FAC with prejudice. The Court denies Plaintiff's request for sanctions, and denies Defendant's motion for sanctions. The Court defers ruling on Defendant's request for attorneys' fees and costs to afford Plaintiff an opportunity to respond. Plaintiff's response, if any, must be filed on or before 5/17/2017. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/8/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 13 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/3/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linlor v. The National Rifle Association of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Linlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Rifle Association of America
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?