IPS Group, Inc. v. Civicsmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IPS Group, Inc.
Defendant: Civicsmart, Inc., Duncan Parking Technologies, Inc. and Duncan Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00632
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER on Motion to Clarify Claim Constructions ( 142 ). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/29/19.(dlg)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Claim Construction Order. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/13/2018. (anh)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction [Doc. Nos. 24 , 41 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/25/2017. (jjg)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER on Motion to Disqualify Counsel [Doc. No. 62 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/17/2017. (jjg)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER For Argument on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/1/2017. (jjg)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery [ECF No. 44 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/27/2017. (jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPS Group, Inc. v. Civicsmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPS Group, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Represented By: Christopher D. Mays
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Scharn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civicsmart, Inc.
Represented By: John E Giust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Parking Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?