HireAHelper, LLC v. Move Lift, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HireAHelper, LLC
Defendant: Move Lift, LLC, Does 1-10 and Simple Movers Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv00711
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 45 ) is Granted. The FAC (ECF No. 23 ) is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 04/17/2018. (ajs)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss HAH's Second Claim for Relief and Third Claim for Relief and denying 17 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/05/2017. (jpp)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Take Hearing Off Calendar; and Denying 12 The Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. The hearing on Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction scheduled for April 24, 2017 at 4:00 P.M. is vacated. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/18/17. (dlg)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The matter before the Court is the Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (ECF No. 2) filed by Plaintiff Hire A Helper LLC ("Plaintiff"). It is order ed that plaintiff's application for a Temporary Restraining Order is denied. Accordingly, for plaintiff to have its request for a preliminary injunction set for a hearing before this Court, plaintiff must serve defendants with all documents f iled in this action to date. Plaintiff must file proof of service in the record of this case no later than 4/10/2017. If plaintiff timely files proof of service in the record of this case, plaintiffs request for a Preliminary Injunction will be set for a hearing on 4/24/2017 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14B. Any opposition by defendants must be filed in the record of this case no later than 4/17/2017. Any reply by plaintiff must be filed in the record of this case no later that 4/19/2017. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/7/2017. (dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HireAHelper, LLC v. Move Lift, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HireAHelper, LLC
Represented By: Duane Scott Horning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Move Lift, LLC
Represented By: David Crockett Lee
Represented By: Ilse Chandalar Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Movers Limited Liability Company
Represented By: David Crockett Lee
Represented By: Ilse Chandalar Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?