Mc-Intosh v. San Diego County Sheriffs Department et al
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Lanarr Mc-Intosh, SR
Defendant: San Diego County Sheriffs Department, N/A Pierson, Weishaar Jweishsh, Daniel Pearce, Unknow, McHenry MMchensh and R. Martinez
Case Number: 3:2017cv00946
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The Court dismisses this civil action in its entirety without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which § 1983 relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and § 1915A(b), and his failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) in compliance with the Court's September 28, 2017 and January 25, 2018 Orders.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER:(1) Granting 8 Motion for Order to Provide Copies; and (2) Sua Sponte Granting Extension of time to File First Amended Complaint. The Court grants Plaintiffs Motion, (ECF No. 8 ) and also denies as moot Plaintiff's January 24, 2018 M otion, (ECF No. 10 ), which requests the same relief. The Court also, sua sponte, grants Plaintiff an extension of time to file a First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading note d in the Courts September 28, 2017 Order, (ECF No. 6 .), on or before forty-five (45) days from the date this Order is published. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Copy of Complaint Mailed to Plaintiff)(mpl)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (1) Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; (2) Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel (3) Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1915A(b)(1). The Court: Denies Plaintiff' ;s Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. (ECF No. 3 ); Grants Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a). (ECF No. 5 ); Orders the Secretary CDCR, or his designee, to collect from Plaintiff's trust accou nt the $350 owed in monthly payments in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in Plaintiff's account exceeds $10 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2).(Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) and Dismisses without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint in its entirety for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)( ii) and § 1915A(b)(1), and grants him forty-five (45) days leave from the date of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/28/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis And Dismissing Action Without Prejudice. It is ordered that Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed IFP is denied without prejudice for failure to prepay the $400 filing fee required. Plaintif f is granted forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order in which to re-open his case by either: (1) paying the entire $400 statutory and administrative filing fee, or (2) filing a new Motion to Proceed IFP, which includes a certi fied copy of his trust account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of his Complaint. If Plaintiff neither pays the $400 filing fee in full nor sufficiently completes and files the attached Motion to Proceed IFP, togethe r with a certified copy of his trust account statement within 45 days, this action will remained dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1914(a), and without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP motion mailed) (dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mc-Intosh v. San Diego County Sheriffs Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Lanarr Mc-Intosh, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N/A Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weishaar Jweishsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHenry MMchensh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?