Smith v. Cook
Plaintiff: Carol Adrianne Smith
Defendant: Andy Cook
Case Number: 3:2017cv00961
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying as Moot 58 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Judgment; Denying Motion to Change Venue ; Granting 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend; Denying as Moot 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur Reply; and Denying 93 Defendant's Motion for Order Declaring Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/29/2018. (acc)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying without prejudice 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/20/2018. (acc)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Withdrawal of Defendant's Attorneys; denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. the Court DENIES Smith's motion for disqualification of Defendant's attorneys and DENIES her motio n for sanctions both WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Doc. Nos. 22, 32.) If Smith wishes to pursue these motions at a later date she is strongly encouraged to carefully review this Order before filing any further inadequate motions before this Court. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/7/2018. (acc)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. ; denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Sua Sponte Dismissing for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; the Court: (1) GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP; (2) sua sponte DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim; and (3) DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel. Pursuant to this Order, Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Amended Order to fil e a new motion to proceed IFP. If Plaintiff chooses to file a new motion to proceed IFP, she must also file her proposed first amended complaint with said motion. If Plaintiff does not file a new motion to proceed IFP and proposed first amended complaint, this action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/16/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Adrianne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?