Bovier v. Bridgepoint Education et al
Plaintiff: Racquel S Bovier
Defendant: Bridgepoint Education, Bridgepoint Education University Governing Board of Regents, Craig Maxwell, Anthony Farrell, Denise Maxwell, John Goodison, Iris Lafferty, Tamecca Fitzpatrick, Judy Donovan, Jackie Kyger, Heather Mason, Alan Belcher and Armondo Dominguez
Case Number: 3:2017cv01052
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING Bridgepoint University Governing Board of Regents as a Non-Existent Defendant and Denying Plaintiff's Motion Request for Relief. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/2/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Defendants' 35 Motion to Dismiss. The Court VACATES the hearing scheduled for this matter on March 2, 2018 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/22/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Defendants' 7 Motion to Quash Service of Summons; and Denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court vacates the hearing scheduled for this matter on November 9, 2017 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/30/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/11/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: (1) denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Dismissing in Part Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); (3) granting Plaintiff Leave to Amend her Complaint within 21 Days of Entry of this Order; and (4) Directing Plaintiff to Pay the filing fee on or by 6/28/2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bovier v. Bridgepoint Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racquel S Bovier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgepoint Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgepoint Education University Governing Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Goodison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamecca Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Kyger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armondo Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?