Owino et al v. CoreCivic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sylvester Owino and Jonathan Gomez
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01112
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Regarding Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 5. The Court ORDERS CoreCivic to prioritize this production and produce this ESI to Plaintiffs by 8/31/2021. For only these two facilities, CoreCivic shall run the full ESI searc h across all previously listed custodians (not limited to ADO-level) and produce this ESI to Plaintiffs by 9/30/2021. A Joint Status Report is due by 10/31/2021. A Discovery Conference is set for 11/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. The Court further ORDERS CoreCivic to provide evidentiary support in the form of an affidavit from a knowledgeable corporate representative that would substantiate this statement by 8/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/30/2021. (tcf)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 220 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Apart from the pending discovery dispute (ECF No. 215 ) and any California-focused discovery consistent with Judge Stormes' resolution of said dispute , the Court STAYS this matter pending resolution of CoreCivic's Rule 23(f) appeal. The Parties SHALL FILE a joint status report, not to exceed twenty (20) pages, within twenty-one (21) days after the Ninth Circuit's mandate issues. The joint status report SHALL INCLUDE specific proposals as to how the Parties wish to proceed with the case at bar in light of the Ninth Circuit's order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/28/2021. (tcf)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Taking Matter under Submission without Oral Argument re 220 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. The Court VACATES the hearing set for 6/10/2021 and takes the matter under submission without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/3/2021. (tcf)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting 213 Joint Motion to Modify Class Notice Plan Deadline. The parties are ORDERED to notify the Court within 3 days of a decision on the pending Rule 23(f) Petition for Permission to Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/9/2021. (tcf)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Regarding Class Notice Plan. The Court will GRANT the request to enlarge to the time to execute the plan to February 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/13/2021. (tcf)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER on Proposed Class Notice Plan. Plaintiffs must make the modifications as outlined above in this Order by December 31, 2020 and provide Defendant with any updated material by the same date. Plaintiffs shall have until January 19, 2020 to begin execution of the class notice plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/18/2020. (tcf)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER on Proposed Notice Plan. Plaintiffs must make any additional content as ordered within 21 days of this order. Within 7 days of Plaintiff providing the additional content, Defendant shall file their objections. The Court will then take the matter under submission and issue an order on any remaining objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/28/2020. (tcf)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER: (1) Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's' motion for partial summary judgment, (2) Denying Defendant's motion for judgement on the pleadings, (3) Denying as moot Plaintiffs' motion to exclude, and (4) Granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (ECF Nos. 97 , 117 , 128 . 155 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/01/2020. (jpp)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER on 102 Discovery Dispute No. 3. Plaintiff's motion for leave to take a second deposition is denied without prejudice. Signed by Nita L. Stormes on 7/3/2019. (jrm)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: (1) Denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration ; and (2) Denying certification for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/26/2019. (jpp)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER on Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute No. 1 (ECF No. 68 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/26/2018. (jdt)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss and Lifting Stay on Proceedings. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/14/2018.(mpl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owino et al v. CoreCivic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Owino
Represented By: Robert L. Teel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Gomez
Represented By: Robert L. Teel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas D. Acedo
Represented By: Ashlee Beth Fletcher
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?