Whitewater West Industries, LTD. v. Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Whitewater West Industries, LTD.
Defendant: Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. and Flow Services, Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv01118
Filed: June 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER Denying 369 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply 378 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/5/2021. (mme)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 197 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike or Exclude the Report and Testimony of James T. Carmichael; (2) Denying 192 Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Denying 200 Plaintiff's First Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 09/13/2019. (mme)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER Regarding Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/22/2019.(anh)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to File Under Seal (ECF Nos. 189 198 201 203 206 213 218 221 224 226 234 237 240 243 245 249 253 ). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/11/19. (dlg)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Redacted ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery and Compel Evidence [ECF. No. 266 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/8/2019. (anh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: # 1 Unredacted for Case Participants Only) (anh).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. No. 62 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/26/2018. (anh)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 91 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/27/2018. (anh)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Denying Defendants' Request to File A Motion for Alternative Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/20/2018.(anh)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Denying Motion to Stay as Moot. [ECF No. 155 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/31/2018. (anh)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying 99 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Sur-Reply or, in the Alternative, to Strike Newly Submitted Evidence. The Court hereby Denies Whitewater's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. The Court further Denies Whitewater's Request to Strike Newly Submitted Evidence. The Motion for Summary Judgment remains under submission. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/25/2018. (anh)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion for Order Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/12/2018. (anh)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Redacted ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Defendants Motion to Compel. Discovery Deadline 7/20/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/8/2018. (anh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2018: # 1 Unredacted for Case Participants Only) (anh).
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/13/2017. (dsn)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: (1) Denying 18 Motion to Dismiss; and (2) Denying 37 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/10/2017. (knb)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Consolidate and Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/3/2017. (knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitewater West Industries, LTD. v. Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitewater West Industries, LTD.
Represented By: Tyler R. Andrews
Represented By: Leanna Costantini
Represented By: Erikson C Squier
Represented By: Joseph R.R. Tache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flow Services, Inc
Represented By: Justin M Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?