Zakosky v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Richard Zakosky
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2017cv01373
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 fl FLSA: Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim since anyallegation of additional facts would not cure the deficiencies. Plaintiff is not permitted leave to amend the complaint since the Court's previous order informed the party that he had one final opportunity to amend the complaint. Plaintiff had a fair opportunity to remedy the deficiencies, and the failure to do so on three separate occasions leads the Court to presume that no further amendments could cure the deficiencies. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied as moot. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. No. 7 ). Plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. P laintiff is permitted leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order in order to cure the noted deficiencies in the complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/20/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's 7 Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/17/2018) (mpl).
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Dismissing complaint without prejudice and Denying 3 Plaintiff's request for Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiff has until November 30, 2017, to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/24/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)(jrd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zakosky v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Zakosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?