The Regents of the University of California et al v. Affymetrix, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California and Becton, Dickinson and Company
Defendant: Affymetrix, Inc. and Life Technologies Corp.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01394
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2018 138 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re 111 Claim Construction Brief filed by Life Technologies Corp., Affymetrix, Inc., 113 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Becton, Dickinson and Company, The Regents of the University of California. After cons idering the parties' briefs, the parties' arguments at the 3/23/2018 claim construction hearing, and all relevant information, Court construes the disputed terms from the '799 patent, the '673 patent, and the '113 patent. Cou rt adopts Defendants' proposed construction as modified for this term, and Court rejects Plaintiffs' proposed construction. Court construes the term "second solvent" as "a liquid other than the solvent of claim 15 that is capable of dissolving another substance". Court adopts the constructions as set forth above. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/26/2018. (jah)
February 23, 2018 105 Opinion or Order of the Court (1) Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Schedule and [Doc. No. 103 ] (2) Amended Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Status Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 3/28/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/23/2018. (jjg)
December 22, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information [Doc. No. 80 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/22/2017. (jjg)
December 15, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 78 Joint Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/15/2017. (jjg)
November 30, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court (1) Order Granting Joint Motion to Advance Claim Construction Schedule; and (2) Amended Scheduling Order [Doc. No. 75 ]. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/30/2017. (jjg)
November 20, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 8 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/20/2017. (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Regents of the University of California et al v. Affymetrix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Barbara A. Fiacco
Represented By: Thomas Jesse Hindman
Represented By: Marco Johnson Quina
Represented By: Donald Ross Ware
Represented By: Lucas Paul Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becton, Dickinson and Company
Represented By: Barbara A. Fiacco
Represented By: Thomas Jesse Hindman
Represented By: Marco Johnson Quina
Represented By: Donald Ross Ware
Represented By: Lucas Paul Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affymetrix, Inc.
Represented By: Roger J Chin
Represented By: Brenda L. Danek
Represented By: Jeffrey Gerard Homrig
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Nathanial J. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Technologies Corp.
Represented By: Roger J Chin
Represented By: Brenda L. Danek
Represented By: Jeffrey Gerard Homrig
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Nathanial J. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?