Moreno v. Paramo et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Moreno
Defendant: Daniel Paramo, R. Walker, Tri Luu and Danny Bates
Case Number: 3:2017cv01449
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING Action Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/6/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1) Sua Ponte Dismissing Defendant Paramo Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and 2) Ordering Plaintiff to Serve Remaining Parties or Request U.S. Marshal Service Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/25/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) and Dismissing Civil Action without Prejudice for Failing to Prepay the Filing Fees Required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) [ECF. No. 2 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/10/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jjg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Paramo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?